Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ramirez, Gary Lee, represented by Gust, James F., in the jurisdiction of Saginaw County, MI, . Saginaw County, MI Superior Courts with Fichtner, Elian E.H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2024 |
CategoryStatute Misdemeanor Criminal |
Last RefreshedApril 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSaginaw County, MI |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing with Remote Participation BENCH TRIAL WITHOUT WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | FILE SENT TO COURT CLERK | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | FILE SENT TO COURTROOM FOR ARRAIGNMENT | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
BOND CONDITION ISSUED - IN LEIN NO CONTACT W/ RYAN STEPHON CARTR |
|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
MITTIMUS 5000 C/S/10%/P, P/NG, SFPT, HIRE OWN ATTY W/PD GATES, NO CONTACT W/ RYAN STEPHON CARTER |
|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | REPRESENTED BY APPOINTED COUNSEL AT ARRAIGNMENT | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ADVICE OF RIGHTS | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
OTHER (SPECIFY) Hiring his own attorney. |
|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT - FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.