Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Cruz, Emmanuel, filed a(n) case represented by David Eric Karson, against Mustafaa, Ciara, in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, MI, . Wayne County, MI Superior Courts with Susan A. Dabaja presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2024 |
|
Last RefreshedMay 11, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationWayne County, MI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Dabaja, Susan A) 06/24/2024 Reset by Court to 10/07/2024 | |
August 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Dabaja, Susan A) 06/24/2024 Reset by Court to 10/07/2024 10/07/2024 Reset by Court to 08/19/2024 | |
June 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Dabaja, Susan A) | |
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Addendum to Protected Personal Identifying Information | |
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Service Review Scheduled | |
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | FOC Investigation Not Requested At County | |
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Confidential Case Inventory | |
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | UCCJEA Affidavit | |
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Filing Fee with Minor Child - Paid | |
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.