Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Mexican Latin Grocers, Inc. vs Waste Management of Minnesota, Inc.
On November 04, 2015 a conciliation case was filed in the jurisdiction of Hennepin County, MN. Judge Benson, Bev presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 04, 2015
Last Refreshed
July 13, 2023
Filing Location
Hennepin County, MN
Case Documents
Order-Other
Date: Feb 18, 2016Order for Judgment and Judgment
Date: Feb 01, 2016Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Other Document | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Counterclaim | |
April 08, 2016 | hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
February 24, 2016 | hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order-Other
Judge: Benson, Bev |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice-Other | |
February 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Other Document | |
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment
Judge: Bauch, Walter |
|
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Continuance | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice-Other | |
November 06, 2015 | hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Statement of Claim and Summons |