Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Wells Fargo Bank N A vs Mary E. Zimmerman
On October 03, 2018 a reduced mortgage redemption case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Ramsey County, MN. Judge Alshouse, Diane presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 03, 2018
Last Refreshed
October 29, 2023
Filing Location
Ramsey County, MN
Category
Reduced Mortgage Redemption
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Affidavit of Mailing Filed By: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank N A Index 10
Date: Nov 29, 2018Order Reducing Redemption Period Index 7
Date: Nov 02, 2018Copy Request Index 6
Date: Nov 01, 2018Affidavit of Mailing Filed By: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank N A Index 5
Date: Oct 24, 2018Affidavit-Other Filed By: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank N A Index 4
Date: Oct 24, 2018Proposed Order or Document Filed By: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank N A Index 3
Date: Oct 24, 2018Summons Filed By: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank N A Index 2
Date: Oct 08, 2018Complaint-Civil Filed By: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank N A Index 1
Date: Oct 03, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Filed By: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank N A Index #10 | |
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party Filed By: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank N A Index #8 | |
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Posting Filed By: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank N A Index #9 | |
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing Index # 10
Judge: Anderson, Wayne D. |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party Index # 8
Judge: Anderson, Wayne D. |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service by Posting Index # 9
Judge: Anderson, Wayne D. |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Redemption Period Reduced (Judicial Officer: Alshouse, Diane R.)
Judge: Anderson, Wayne D. |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Reducing Redemption Period Index #7 | |
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Reducing Redemption Period Index # 7
Judge: Anderson, Wayne D. |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index #6 | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Copy Request Index # 6
Judge: Anderson, Wayne D. |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Filed By: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank N A Index #5 | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit-Other Filed By: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank N A Index #4 | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Filed By: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank N A Index #3 | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing Index # 5
Judge: Anderson, Wayne D. |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 3
Judge: Anderson, Wayne D. |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit-Other Index # 4
Judge: Anderson, Wayne D. |
|
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons Filed By: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank N A Index #2 | |
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 2
Judge: Anderson, Wayne D. |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint-Civil Filed By: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank N A Index #1 | |
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint-Civil Index # 1
Judge: Anderson, Wayne D. |