Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
62-CV-20-5325
On November 09, 2020 a consumer credit contract case was filed in the jurisdiction of Ramsey County, MN. Judge Diane R. Alshouse presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 09, 2020
Last Refreshed
October 10, 2022
Filing Location
Ramsey County, MN
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Guthmann, John H.;Category
Consumer Credit Contract
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Consumer Debt
Status
Summary Judgment
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index # 18 | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Processed Judgment Entry and Docketing | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 17 | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Summary judgment granted Monetary Award ( Status: Active , Debtor: PARI P BAZOOBAND , Entered: 02/05/2021 , Docketed: 02/05/2021 , 10:36 AM , Original Principal: $11,456.27 ) | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order Index # 16 (Judicial Officer: Alshouse, Diane R. )
Judge: Alshouse, Diane R. |
|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index # 15 | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended Motion Index # 13 | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 14 | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order-Other Index # 12 (Judicial Officer: Guthmann, John H\. )
Judge: Guthmann, John H. |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 11 | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Filing Index # 10 | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index # 9 | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 8 | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit-Other Index # 7 | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Plaintiff Index # 6 | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum Index # 5 | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion and Motion Index # 4 | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet Index # 3 | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint Index # 1 | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index # 2 |