Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
AMNL ASSET COMPANY 1 LLC V CHERI HERRERA (E-CASE)
On July 31, 2023 an ac rent and possession case was filed in the jurisdiction of Cass County, MO. Judge COX, JEFF presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 31, 2023
Last Refreshed
October 20, 2023
Filing Location
Cass County, MO
Filing Court House
MO-Cass
Category
AC Rent and Possession
Case Outcome Type
Dismissed by Parties
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Case Documents
Notice of Dismissal
Date: Aug 29, 2023Notice
Date: Aug 29, 2023Posted - Residence
Date: Aug 14, 2023Summons Issued-Landlord/Tenant
Date: Aug 01, 2023Order to Post Summons
Date: Aug 01, 2023Order - Special Process Server
Date: Aug 01, 2023Pet Filed in Associate Ct
Date: Jul 31, 2023Motion to Post Summons
Date: Jul 31, 2023Motion Special Process Server
Date: Jul 31, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing/Trial Cancelled | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Parties | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Posted - Residence | |
August 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued-Landlord/Tenant | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to Post Summons | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Order - Special Process Server | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Setting Scheduled | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Pet Filed in Associate Ct | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Post Summons | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Special Process Server | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Filing Info Sheet eFiling |