Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Christian County, MO, . Christian County, MO Superior Courts MO-Christian with LUNA, LARRY G presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 06, 2016 |
CategoryAc Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationChristian County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-Christian |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: September 20, 2016Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court
Date: December 06, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Assignment of Judgment | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Assignment of Judgment; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: TAMMY FAY WOOL \n On Behalf Of: SYNCHRONY BANK |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Release Filed | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Garn Release/Return/Recall | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Garn Release/Return/Recall Release on Garnishment/Execution Number 19-GARN-921 |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Release Filed Garnishment Release; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: ADAM DAVID TUCKER \n On Behalf Of: SYNCHRONY BANK |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Garnishment Certificate of Service; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. On Behalf Of: SYNCHRONY BANK |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Garnishment Returned Served | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.