Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Light, Ii , Kevin, filed a(n) Fc Motion To Modify case against Light , Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, MO, . Jefferson County, MO Superior Courts MO-Jefferson with Darrell E. Missey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryFc Motion To Modify |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationJefferson County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Jefferson |
Case Outcome TypeConsent Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Returned Mail-Undeliverable | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail-Undeliverable RETURNED MAIL |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Certif Copies/Leg File Prepard | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certif Copies/Leg File Prepard ONE CERT COPY OF ORDER SENT TO FSD |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Confid Dom Rel Info File Sheet | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Confid Dom Rel Info File Sheet Information Statement. Filed By: Kim Rensing \n On Behalf Of: KEVIN LIGHT, II |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge/Clerk - Note | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note PLEASE FILE A COMPLETED INFORMATION STATEMENT TO PROCESS CHILD SUPPORT AND OR MAINTENANCE ORDERS. ALL ORDERS MUST BE ENTERED INTO THE MISSOURI AUTOMATED CHILD SUPPORT SYSTEM INCLUDING $0, DIRECT PAY, NO ORDER OF CHILD SUPPORT, FSPC AS THE TRUSTEE, ORDER BEING PAID BY IWO. PLEASE INCLUDE ALL INFORMATION REQUESTED |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge/Clerk - Note | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.