Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
COURTESY LOANS OF MISSOURI V CLAUDIA FILLICETTI (E-CASE)
On April 16, 2024 an ac promissory note case was filed in the jurisdiction of Pettis County, MO.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 16, 2024
Last Refreshed
April 18, 2024
Filing Location
Pettis County, MO
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
AC Promissory Note
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Promissory Note
Case Outcome Type
Not Disposed
Status
Closed
Parties
Case Documents
Summons Issued-Associate
Date: Apr 17, 2024Pet Filed in Associate Ct
Date: Apr 16, 2024Motion Special Process Server
Date: Apr 16, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Issued-Associate | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Order - Special Process Server | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Pet Filed in Associate Ct | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion Special Process Server | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Filing Info Sheet eFiling |