Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hatton , Tonet, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Marty , Andrew Hampton, against Vandeman , Kelvin Lynn, represented by Gausnell , Seth G, in the jurisdiction of St. Charles County, MO, . St. Charles County, MO Superior Courts MO-St Charles Circuit Div with Nancy Schneider presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2015 |
CategoryCc Small Claims Trial De Novo |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSt. Charles County, MO |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseMO-St Charles Circuit Div |
Case Outcome TypeTried By Court-Civil |
Judgment Entered
Date: August 30, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered JUDGMENT AND ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF MINOR'S CLAIMS AND DISTRIBUTION OF NET PROCEEDS. SO ORDERED TH/mls Filed By: TED HOUSE |
|
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL. SO ORDERED TH/mls Filed By: TED HOUSE |
|
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Tried by Court-Civil Associated Entries: 08/02/2017 - Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 08/30/2017; 9:00 AM ; TED HOUSE; St Charles Circuit Div |
|
August 02, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 08/30/2017 - Tried by Court-Civil \n Scheduled For: 08/30/2017; 9:00 AM ; TED HOUSE; St Charles Circuit Div |
|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION, PLAINTIFF'S MOTION AND APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENT AND DISTRIBUTION OF NET PROCEEDS SHALL BE TAKEN UP AND HEARD AT 9 AM 8-30-17. SO ORDERED TH/mls Filed By: TED HOUSE |
|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Filed Proposed Judgment and Order Approving Settlement of Minors Claims; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: ANDREW HAMPTON MARTY \n On Behalf Of: TONET HATTON |
|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify Plt s Motion and Application for Court Approval of Minors Settlement; Exhibit A; Exhibit B 1; Exhibit B 2; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: ANDREW HAMPTON MARTY \n On Behalf Of: KYLE HATTON |
|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Served Affidavit of Special Process Server of Subpoena Served upon Custodian of Records St Charles Psychiatric Associates; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: SETH G GAUSNELL \n On Behalf Of: KELVIN LYNN VANDEMAN |
|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settled Case Filed Passed for Settlement Memo; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: SETH G GAUSNELL \n On Behalf Of: KELVIN LYNN VANDEMAN |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice to Take Deposition Amended Notice to Take Deposition of Custodian of Records St Charles Psychiatric Associates; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: SETH G GAUSNELL \n On Behalf Of: KELVIN LYNN VANDEMAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.