Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LUNA HOYT V WILLIAM LABBE (E-CASE)
On October 27, 2022 a cc pers injury-vehicular case was filed by Hoyt , Luna, represented by Guerra , Jason D, against Labbe , William, in the jurisdiction of St. Charles County, MO. Judge W. Chris McDonough presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 27, 2022
Last Refreshed
September 12, 2023
Filing Location
St. Charles County, MO
Filing Court House
MO-St Charles Circuit Div
Category
CC Pers Injury-Vehicular
Case Outcome Type
Not Disposed
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Ext of Time | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Filed | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance Filed | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Family Member/Roommate Served | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Order - Special Process Server | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Mgmt Conf Scheduled | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued-Circuit | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Special Process Server | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Reinstate | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Summ Req-Circuit Pers Serv | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Special Process Server | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Filed | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Note to Clerk eFiling | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition: | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Non-Est | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Filing Info Sheet eFiling | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Order - Special Process Server | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Issued-Circuit | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Special Process Server | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Pet Filed in Circuit Ct | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pet Filed in Circuit Ct Petition. Filed By: JASON D GUERRA |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Circuit Document ID: 22-SMCC-2013, for LABBE, WILLIAM. SUMMONS SAVED AND ATTACHED IN PDF FORM FOR ATTORNEY TO RETRIEVE FROM SECURE CASE.NET. MLS |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Special Process Server ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER Associated Entries: 10/27/2022 - Motion Special Process Server MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Special Process Server MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER Filed By: JASON D GUERRA \n On Behalf Of: LUNA HOYT \n Associated Entries: 10/27/2022 - Order - Special Process Server ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filing Info Sheet eFiling Filed By: JASON D GUERRA |