Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ebaugh , Brenda, filed a(n) Cc Pers Injury-Other case represented by Cox , Ryan R, against Atlas Group, Llc, Webb , Chelsie, in the jurisdiction of St. Charles County, MO, . St. Charles County, MO Superior Courts MO-St Charles Circuit Div with ALESSI, DEBORAH JEAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2023 |
CategoryCc Pers Injury-Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSt. Charles County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-St Charles Circuit Div |
Case Outcome TypeRemoved To Fed Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Removed to Fed Court | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Personally Served | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge/Clerk - Note | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Change of Judge | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Change of Judge | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued-Circuit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.