Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Valleroy , Misti filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Paradise , Olivia, in the jurisdiction of St. Louis County, MO, . St. Louis County, MO Superior Courts MO-St Louis County with Jeffrey P. Medler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2022 |
CategoryAc Property Damage |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSt. Louis County, MO |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseMO-St Louis County |
Case Outcome TypeNot Disposed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2023 | Hearing | Notice of Court Hearing Sent | |
June 21, 2023 | Hearing | Dismissal Hearing Scheduled | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Non-Est | |
January 17, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Alias Summons Issued | |
January 17, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Scheduled | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Alias Summons Requested | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Non-Est | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.