Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LANDY K HAYES V JOHN ARMENO ET AL (E-CASE)
On July 01, 2019 an ac rent and possession case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Warren County, MO. Judge SCHEIBE, RICHARD L presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 01, 2019
Last Refreshed
October 17, 2023
Filing Location
Warren County, MO
Filing Court House
MO-Warren
Judge
Category
AC Rent and Possession
Case Outcome Type
Consent Judgment
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Judgment Entered
Date: Nov 06, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Copy of Judgment mailed to Defendants. Consent Judgment against John Armeno in the amount of $1,695.00 total, plus costs and service fees $101.50. Default Judgment against Nicole Misuraca. Judgment for possession of premises also. |
|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Consent Judgment | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Consent Judgment Judgment for Plaintiff and against Defendants. So Ordered. RLS Associated Entries: 10/23/2019 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Associated Entries: 10/23/2019 - Court Trial Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 11/06/2019; 10:30 AM ; RICHARD L SCHEIBE; Warren |
|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing Sent | |
October 24, 2019 | hearing |
Notice of Court Hearing Sent Notice of Hearing mailed to Defendants. |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Court Trial Scheduled | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
October 23, 2019 | hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 10/23/2019; 10:30 AM Court Trial |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Scheduled Associated Entries: 11/06/2019 - Consent Judgment Judgment for Plaintiff and against Defendants. So Ordered. RLS \n Scheduled For: 11/06/2019; 10:30 AM ; RICHARD L SCHEIBE; Warren |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing Sent | |
September 19, 2019 | hearing |
Notice of Court Hearing Sent Notice of Hearing mailed to Defendants. |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Court Trial Scheduled | |
September 18, 2019 | hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 09/18/2019; 10:30 AM Court Trial |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Scheduled Associated Entries: 10/23/2019 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 10/23/2019; 10:30 AM ; RICHARD L SCHEIBE; Warren |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing Sent | |
August 22, 2019 | hearing |
Notice of Court Hearing Sent Notice of Hearing mailed to Defendants. |
|
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Court Trial Scheduled | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Scheduled Associated Entries: 09/18/2019 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 09/18/2019; 10:30 AM ; RICHARD L SCHEIBE; Warren |
|
August 21, 2019 | hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 08/21/2019; 10:30 AM Court Trial |
|
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Court Trial Scheduled | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Scheduled Associated Entries: 08/21/2019 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 08/21/2019; 10:30 AM ; RICHARD L SCHEIBE; Warren |
|
July 17, 2019 | hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 07/17/2019; 10:30 AM Court Trial |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Family Member/Roommate Served | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons Personally Served | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Family Member/Roommate Served Document ID - 19-SMLT-171; Served To - ARMENO, JOHN; Server - ; Served Date - 02-JUL-19; Served Time - 14:16:00; Service Type - Special Process Server; Reason Description - Served; Service Text - SERVED TO NICOLE MISURACA |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service Return of Service - served; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Document ID # 19-SMLT-173. Filed By: TIMOTHY MICHAEL JOYCE |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Personally Served Document ID - 19-SMLT-173; Served To - MISURACA, NICOLE; Server - ; Served Date - 02-JUL-19; Served Time - 14:16:00; Service Type - Special Process Server; Reason Description - Served; Service Text - PERSONAL SERVICE |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service Return of Service - served; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Posting Document ID # 19-SM51-18. Filed By: TIMOTHY MICHAEL JOYCE |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service Return of Service - served; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Posting Document ID # 19-SM51-19. Filed By: TIMOTHY MICHAEL JOYCE \n On Behalf Of: LANDY K HAYES |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service Return of Service - served; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Document ID # 19-SMLT-171. Filed By: TIMOTHY MICHAEL JOYCE |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons Posted | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons Issued-Landlord/Tenant | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Order - Special Process Server | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Retn Serv-Reg/Cert Mail Succs | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Court Trial Scheduled | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Landlord/Tenant Document ID: 19-SMLT-173, for MISURACA, NICOLE. To attorney for service. clb |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Landlord/Tenant Document ID: 19-SMLT-171, for ARMENO, JOHN. To attorney for service. clb |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Scheduled Associated Entries: 07/17/2019 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 07/17/2019; 10:30 AM ; RICHARD L SCHEIBE; Warren |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Retn Serv-Reg/Cert Mail Succs Document ID - 19-SM51-18; Served To - ARMENO, JOHN; Server - ; Served Date - 02-JUL-19; Served Time - 09:49:00; Service Type - First Class Mail; Reason Description - Served; Service Text - BY MAIL |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Posted Document ID: 19-SM51-18, for ARMENO, JOHN. To attorney for service. clb |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Posted Document ID: 19-SM51-19, for MISURACA, NICOLE. To attorney for service. clb |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service Return of Service - mailed. Filed By: TIMOTHY MICHAEL JOYCE \n On Behalf Of: LANDY K HAYES |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Retn Serv-Reg/Cert Mail Succs Document ID - 19-SM51-19; Served To - MISURACA, NICOLE; Server - ; Served Date - 02-JUL-19; Served Time - 09:49:00; Service Type - First Class Mail; Reason Description - Served; Service Text - BY MAIL |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order - Special Process Server Associated Entries: 07/01/2019 - Motion Special Process Server Motion for Special Process Server. |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service Return of Service - mailed. Filed By: TIMOTHY MICHAEL JOYCE |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Note to Clerk eFiling | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion Special Process Server | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Pet Filed in Associate Ct | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Filing Info Sheet eFiling | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Pet Filed in Associate Ct Petition for Rent and Possession; Exhibit 1. |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Note to Clerk eFiling Filed By: TIMOTHY MICHAEL JOYCE |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Special Process Server Motion for Special Process Server. Filed By: TIMOTHY MICHAEL JOYCE \n On Behalf Of: LANDY K HAYES \n Associated Entries: 07/02/2019 - Order - Special Process Server |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Filing Info Sheet eFiling Filed By: TIMOTHY MICHAEL JOYCE |