Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CELESTE GROS V ANCO INSULATION INC ET AL (E-CASE)
On August 07, 2018 cc asbestos case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of St. Louis City, MO. Judge NOBLE, MICHAEL WARREN presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 07, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 30, 2022
Filing Location
St. Louis City, MO
Filing Court House
MO-City of St. Louis
Category
CC Asbestos
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Mass Torts
Case Outcome Type
Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal CAUSE DISMISSED BY COURT FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SO ORDERED JUDGE MICHAEL NOBLE 57093 |
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice | |
March 23, 2020 | hearing |
Dismissal Hearing Held Scheduled For: 03/23/2020; 9:30 AM ; MICHAEL WARREN NOBLE; Carnahan Courthouse |
|
February 28, 2020 | hearing |
Dismissal Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 03/23/2020 - Dismissal Hearing Held \n Scheduled For: 03/23/2020; 9:30 AM ; MICHAEL WARREN NOBLE; Carnahan Courthouse |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note CAUSE PLACED ON DISMISSAL DOCKET MARCH 23, 2020, AT 9:30 |
|
February 10, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing/Trial Cancelled Scheduled For: 02/10/2020; 9:00 AM ; MICHAEL WARREN NOBLE; Carnahan Courthouse |
|
January 16, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing/Trial Cancelled Scheduled For: 02/10/2020; 9:00 AM ; REX M BURLISON; City of St. Louis |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Scheduled Associated Entries: 02/10/2020 - Hearing/Trial Cancelled \n Scheduled For: 02/10/2020; 9:00 AM ; MICHAEL WARREN NOBLE; Carnahan Courthouse |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ord Transfer P/Judge for Assn Cause assigned to Division # 22 for trial on 02/10/20. see Court Order. So Ordered: Rex Burlison, Judge |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Scheduled Associated Entries: 01/16/2020 - Hearing/Trial Cancelled \n Scheduled For: 02/10/2020; 9:00 AM ; REX M BURLISON; City of St. Louis |
|
December 16, 2019 | hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 12/16/2019; 9:00 AM Jury Trial |
|
October 16, 2019 | hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 10/21/2019; 9:00 AM Jury Trial |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Scheduled Associated Entries: 12/16/2019 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 12/16/2019; 9:00 AM ; REX M BURLISON; City of St. Louis |
|
September 03, 2019 | hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 09/03/2019; 9:00 AM Jury Trial |
|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Scheduled Associated Entries: 10/16/2019 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 10/21/2019; 9:00 AM ; REX M BURLISON; City of St. Louis |
|
July 22, 2019 | hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 07/15/2019; 9:00 AM Jury Trial |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Scheduled Associated Entries: 09/03/2019 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 09/03/2019; 9:00 AM ; REX M BURLISON; City of St. Louis |
|
June 03, 2019 | hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 06/03/2019; 9:00 AM Jury Trial |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Scheduled Associated Entries: 07/22/2019 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 07/15/2019; 9:00 AM ; REX M BURLISON; City of St. Louis |
|
April 08, 2019 | hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 04/08/2019; 9:00 AM Jury Trial |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Scheduled Associated Entries: 06/03/2019 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 06/03/2019; 9:00 AM ; REX M BURLISON; City of St. Louis |
|
February 25, 2019 | hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 02/25/2019; 9:00 AM Jury Trial |
|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Scheduled Associated Entries: 04/08/2019 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 04/08/2019; 9:00 AM ; REX M BURLISON; City of St. Louis |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed ENTRY OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: CHARLES L JOLEY |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY TO PLAINTIFF'S PETITION AND TO CROSS-CLAIMS OF ANY AND ALL OTHER DEFENDANTS AND THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS WITH JURY DEMAND ENDORSED THEREON; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: CHARLES L JOLEY |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Jury Trial DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY; ELECTRONIC FILING CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Filed By: CHARLES L JOLEY |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: CHARLES L JOLEY \n On Behalf Of: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: CHARLES L JOLEY |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing: State of MO - Dept of Insurance, Financial Institutions and Professional Registration |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Scheduled Associated Entries: 02/25/2019 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 02/25/2019; 9:00 AM ; REX M BURLISON; City of St. Louis |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Info Sheet eFiling Filed By: WILSON DOUGLAS SIKES |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Pet Filed in Circuit Ct Petition. Filed By: WILSON DOUGLAS SIKES |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Filed Memorandum. Filed By: WILSON DOUGLAS SIKES \n On Behalf Of: REILLY BENTON COMPANY INC |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Reg/Cert Mail Document ID: 18-SMCM-225, for GOODRICH CORPORATION. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Reg/Cert Mail Document ID: 18-SMCM-222, for DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Reg/Cert Mail Document ID: 18-SMCM-220, for ANCO INSULATION INC. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Reg/Cert Mail Document ID: 18-SMCM-226, for HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Reg/Cert Mail Document ID: 18-SMCM-221, for BASF CORPORATION. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Reg/Cert Mail Document ID: 18-SMCM-224, for EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Reg/Cert Mail Document ID: 18-SMCM-223, for ETHYL CORPORATION. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Reg/Cert Mail Document ID: 18-SMCM-219, for REILLY BENTON COMPANY INC. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice/Acknowledgement Issued Document ID: 18-NASM-218, for BASF CORPORATION. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice/Acknowledgement Issued Document ID: 18-NASM-222, for GOODRICH CORPORATION. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice/Acknowledgement Issued Document ID: 18-NASM-227, for METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice/Acknowledgement Issued Document ID: 18-NASM-228, for OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice/Acknowledgement Issued Document ID: 18-NASM-224, for INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice/Acknowledgement Issued Document ID: 18-NASM-231, for UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice/Acknowledgement Issued Document ID: 18-NASM-220, for ETHYL CORPORATION. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Reg/Cert Mail Document ID: 18-SMCM-228, for JP BUSHNELL PACKING SUPPLY CO. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Reg/Cert Mail Document ID: 18-SMCM-229, for MCCARTY CORPORATION. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Reg/Cert Mail Document ID: 18-SMCM-233, for TAYLOR-SEIDENBACH INC. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Reg/Cert Mail Document ID: 18-SMCM-230, for METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Reg/Cert Mail Document ID: 18-SMCM-227, for INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice/Acknowledgement Issued Document ID: 18-NASM-225, for JP BUSHNELL PACKING SUPPLY CO. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice/Acknowledgement Issued Document ID: 18-NASM-216, for REILLY BENTON COMPANY INC. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Reg/Cert Mail Document ID: 18-SMCM-232, for SHELL OIL COMPANY. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice/Acknowledgement Issued Document ID: 18-NASM-230, for TAYLOR-SEIDENBACH INC. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice/Acknowledgement Issued Document ID: 18-NASM-229, for SHELL OIL COMPANY. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice/Acknowledgement Issued Document ID: 18-NASM-221, for EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice/Acknowledgement Issued Document ID: 18-NASM-226, for MCCARTY CORPORATION. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice/Acknowledgement Issued Document ID: 18-NASM-223, for HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Reg/Cert Mail Document ID: 18-SMCM-234, for UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice/Acknowledgement Issued Document ID: 18-NASM-217, for ANCO INSULATION INC. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Reg/Cert Mail Document ID: 18-SMCM-231, for OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice/Acknowledgement Issued Document ID: 18-NASM-219, for DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY. |