Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
G Of L Corp vs David Cooper
A Landlord/Tenant case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV. Judge Sally Loehrer presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 17, 2008
Last Refreshed
November 23, 2020
Filing Location
Clark County, NV
Category
Landlord/Tenant
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Status
Judgment on Award
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 11 Reassigned From Judge Bell - Dept 7 |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 7 District Court Case Reassignment 2015 |
|
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 14 Case reassigned from Judge Bell |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Arbitration File | |
September 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Notice of Address Change and Facsimile Change |
|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address and Facsimile | |
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice To Prevailing Party That Final Judgment May Now Be Entered On Arbitration Award | |
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Answer to Amended Complaint | |
May 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF COUNTER DEFENDANT AND THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS | |
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Vacated |
|
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event | MEDIA REQUEST AND ORDER FOR CAMERA ACCESS TO COURT PROCEEDINGS | |
August 15, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
August 14, 2008 | Docket Event | COUNTERCLAIM AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT | |
August 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion PLTF'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR EVICTION/2 Court Clerk: Jennifer Kimmel Reporter/Recorder: Julie Lever Heard By: Sally Loehrer Matter argued and submitted. COURT NOTED, Deft. brought no canceled checks indicating he has paid the rent. COURT ORDERED, Pltf's Motion is GRANTED, Deft. Cooper shall pay the sum of $17,600.00 by NOON on Friday (8/15/08) or he will be EVICTED at 5:00 P.M. same date. COURT STATED, sum represents July and August rent plus 10%. ($8,000. x 2 = $16,000. + $1,600. = $17,600.). Court directed Mr. Cannon to prepare the Order. |
|
August 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion PLTF'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR EVICTION/2 |
|
August 01, 2008 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO FIVE DAY NOTICE | |
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION TO STAY ORDER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFT'S MTN TO STAY ORDER FOR VR 8/22/08 JUDGMENT /1 |
|
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUMMARY EVICTION | |
July 17, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED Fee $148.00 | |
July 17, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLAINT FOR SUMMARY EVICTION | |
July 17, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |