Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Neiman Marcus vs Jack Zwerner, Judy Zwerner
A Breach Of Contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV. Judge Huffaker, Stephen presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 14, 1995
Last Refreshed
January 28, 2021
Filing Location
Clark County, NV
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Elizabeth Gonzalez;Category
Breach of Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Default Judgment Plus Interest
Status
Default Judgment
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Renewal of Judgment Affidavit of Plaintiff for Renewal of Judgment Pursuant to N.R.S. 17.214 |
|
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
September 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record | |
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Motion to Withdraw As Attorney of Record Upon review of the papers and pleadings on file in this Matter, as proper service has been provided, this Court notes no opposition has been filed. Accordingly, pursuant to EDCR 2.20(b) the Motion to Withdraw is deemed unopposed. Therefore, good cause appearing, COURT ORDERED, Motion is GRANTED. Moving Counsel is to prepare and submit an order including the last known address and all upcoming dates within ten (10) days and distribute a filed copy to all parties involved in this matter. CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was placed in the attorney folder(s) of: Michael Van, Esq. (Shumway, Van & Hansen) and Counsel to notify all parties. Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
August 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
August 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw As Counsel Motion to Withdraw As Attorney of Record |
|
July 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum | |
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Deposition Notice of Post-Judgment Deposition, Duces Tecum, of Jack B. Zwerner |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Deposition, Duces Tecum, of Judy Zwerner | |
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Statistically Close Case | |
October 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Purchase of Plaintiffs Judgment and Appearance of Counsel | |
February 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing HEARING RE: SHOW CAUSE CONS W/A352726 & A355021 Relief Clerk: Willa Pettice Reporter/Recorder: Jill Hawkins Heard By: Elizabeth Gonzalez Jeffrey J. Todd, Esq., appeared on behalf of Pltf. The Court NOTED Deft has not been served and ORDERED, matter OFF CALENDAR. Mr. Todd requested attorney's fees. The Court DIRECTED Mr. Todd to file a written Motion. Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
December 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type HEARING RE: SHOW CAUSE CONS W/A352726 & A355021 |
|
December 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing HEARING RE: SHOW CAUSE (CONS W/A352726 & A355021) Court Clerk: Kathy Klein Reporter/Recorder: Jill Hawkins Heard By: Elizabeth Gonzalez Mr. Varricchio advised he was unable to serve and noted he would re-notice this. COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED. Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth) HEARING RE: SHOW CAUSE (CONS W/A352726 & A355021 |
|
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
November 14, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR TURNOVER OF DEFENDANTS PROPERTY AND NOTICE TO APPEAR | |
November 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing HEARING RE: SHOW CAUSE (CONS W/A352726 & A355021) Court Clerk: Kathy Klein Reporter/Recorder: Jill Hawkins Heard By: Elizabeth Gonzalez No parties being present, COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED. Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth) HEARING RE: SHOW CAUSE (CONS W/A352726 & A355021 |
|
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
September 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing HEARING RE: SHOW CAUSE (CONS W/A352726 & A355021) Court Clerk: Kathy Klein Reporter/Recorder: Jill Hawkins Heard By: Elizabeth Gonzalez Mr. Van provided the declaration of Mr. Zwerner and marked as Court's exhibit. Mr. Van further noted the bracelet was sold 07/04/07. Arguments by Counsel. COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED. Mr. Varricchio to file an Order to Produce. Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth) HEARING RE: SHOW CAUSE (CONS W/A352726 & A355021 |
|
August 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order SECOND AMENDED ORDER IN AIDE OF EXECUTION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR TURNOVER OF DEFENDANTS PROPERTY AND NOTICE TO APPEAR |
|
August 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing HEARING RE: SHOW CAUSE (CONS W/A352726 & A355021) Court Clerk: Kathy Klein Reporter/Recorder: Jill Hawkins Heard By: Elizabeth Gonzalez At the request of counsel, COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED. Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth) HEARING RE: SHOW CAUSE (CONS W/A352726 & A355021 |
|
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing Vacated Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type HEARING RE: SHOW CAUSE (CONS W/A352726 & A355021) |
|
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order AMENDED ORDER IN AIDE OF EXECUTION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR TURNOVER OF DEFTS PROPERTY AND NOTICE TO APPEAR |
|
June 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type HEARING RE: SHOW CAUSE VE 7/9/08 |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Change of Address NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS |
|
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER IN AIDE OF EXECUTION |
|
May 10, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR | |
April 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXAMAINTION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR |
|
April 24, 2007 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR | |
January 23, 2007 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING . | |
January 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment RENEWAL OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT+INTEREST |
|
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Change of Address NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS |
|
September 22, 2006 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT RENEWING JUDGMENT (CONS A-352726) | |
November 02, 2005 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM | |
August 24, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
May 14, 2001 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF RECORDATION OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT | |
April 18, 2001 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING | |
April 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
Judgment DEFAULT JUDGMENT PLUS INTEREST |
|
April 12, 2001 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO NRS 17.214 | |
October 13, 2000 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
September 25, 2000 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AGAINST JACK ZWERNER (A352726) | |
September 21, 2000 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS | |
July 24, 2000 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Vacated |
|
June 26, 2000 | Docket Event |
Motion ALBERT THIEL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
December 18, 1998 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM | |
November 25, 1998 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR | |
November 23, 1998 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR | |
November 23, 1998 | Docket Event |
Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR |
|
December 03, 1997 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
November 26, 1997 | Docket Event |
Brief THIEL'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL/STAY CASE |
|
November 25, 1997 | Docket Event |
Supplemental JACK ZWERNER'S SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO STAY CIVIL PROCEEDINGS |
|
November 21, 1997 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF COPY | |
November 18, 1997 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Vacated |
|
November 10, 1997 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION |
|
November 10, 1997 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFT'S Motion for Continuance |
|
November 10, 1997 | Docket Event |
ALL PENDING MOTIONS 11/10/97 Court Clerk: DEBRA VINSON Heard By: Stephen Huffaker DEFT'S Motion for Continuance...DEFT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION...CALENDAR CALL Mr. Varricchio advised judgment has been obtained against Mr. Zwerner in the instant case, which should now be CLOSED, SO ORDERED. Trial will go forward under A352726, Thiel vs. Zwerner. |
|
November 10, 1997 | Docket Event | CALENDAR CALL | |
November 10, 1997 | Docket Event |
Motion ALL PENDING MOTIONS 11/10/97 |
|
November 07, 1997 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
November 07, 1997 | Docket Event |
Opposition THIEL'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL/RECONSIDER |
|
November 07, 1997 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial Memorandum THIEL'S UNILATERAL PRE TRIAL MEMORANDUM |
|
November 07, 1997 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial Memorandum PRE TRIAL MEMORANDUM |
|
November 04, 1997 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFT'S Motion for Continuance |
|
November 04, 1997 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION |
|
October 28, 1997 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER | |
October 23, 1997 | Docket Event |
Order to Withdraw as Attorney of Record ORDER |
|
October 20, 1997 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY CIVIL PROCEEDINGS | |
October 20, 1997 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw as Counsel DENNIS LEAVITT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL Relief Clerk: MARY DAIGLE/md Heard By: Stephen Huffaker COURT ORDERED, no opposition, motion GRANTED. CLERK'S NOTE: The clerk placed copy of minute order in the folder of Dennis Leavitt, Esq. Mr. Leavitt to prepare order and notify all interested parties. |
|
October 20, 1997 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |
October 06, 1997 | Docket Event |
Motion to Stay DEFT'S MOTION TO STAY CIVIL PROCEEDING Court Clerk: DEBRA VINSON Heard By: Stephen Huffaker Court advised it sees no reason to stay the civil proceeding and ORDERED MOTION DENIED. CLERK'S NOTE: Clerk placed copy of minute order in Mr. Muije's attorney folder. Mr. Muije to prepare the order and notify all interested parties. |
|
September 26, 1997 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY CIVIL PROCEEDINGS | |
September 17, 1997 | Docket Event |
Motion DENNIS LEAVITT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL |
|
September 17, 1997 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
September 11, 1997 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFT'S MOTION TO STAY CIVIL PROCEEDING |
|
August 26, 1997 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Civil Non-Jury Trial ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL |
|
July 21, 1997 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss LVMPD'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM Court Clerk: DEBRA VINSON Heard By: Stephen Huffaker There being no opposition, COURT ORDERED MOTION GRANTED. CLERK'S NOTE: Clerk placed copy of minute order in District Attorney's folder with attention directed to Liz McDonald, DDA. Ms. McDonald to notify all interested parties. |
|
July 15, 1997 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM | |
July 08, 1997 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER | |
June 26, 1997 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | |
June 25, 1997 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal ORDER DISMISSING INTERPLEADER, CASE NO. A355021, ONLY |
|
June 18, 1997 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM | |
June 18, 1997 | Docket Event |
Motion LVMPD'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM |
|
June 16, 1997 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY COMMISSIONERS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS | |
June 16, 1997 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss PLTF'S MOTION TO DISMISS INTERPLEADER Court Clerk: DEBRA VINSON Heard By: Stephen Huffaker Liz McDonald, Esq., present on behalf of Metropolitan Police Department. COURT ORDERED MOTION GRANTED. Mr. Leavitt advised deft. wishes to have an accounting as there may have been some personal belongings in the truck. Upon inquiry by the Court, Ms. McDonald advised she does not have an accounting at this time. Court advised counsel to try and get ahold of an inventory as to what was in the truck. Ms. McDonald advised Michael Kaplan has filed a counterclaim against METRO and the Court advised that issue is not before the Court at this time. |
|
June 06, 1997 | Docket Event |
Response JACK ZWERNER'S RESPONSE TO THIEL'S MOTION TO DISMISS INTERPLEADER |
|
May 23, 1997 | Docket Event |
Joint Case Conference Report JACK ZWERNERS UNILATERAL JOINT CASE CONFERENCE REPORT |
|
May 20, 1997 | Docket Event |
Motion PLTF'S MOTION TO DISMISS INTERPLEADER |
|
May 20, 1997 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER | |
May 19, 1997 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING MEMO | |
May 07, 1997 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY CONFERENCE Court Clerk: MARY DAIGLE Heard By: Thomas Biggar David Mincin, Esq., present, representing pltf. Thiel in case A352726. Christopher P. Burke, Esq., also present. Colloquy among Commissioner and counsel regarding status of the case. The Commissioner stated deft. Zwerner does not have Fifth Amendment right not to testify but he has to live with the consequences in a civil case. Mr. Mincin argued deft. Zwerner ignores notices to appear, picks and chooses as to when to file and then plays dumb. Further argument by counsel. The Commissioner stated he does not have a case conference report from pltf. Neiman Marcus. Mr. Burke advised deft. Thiel filed it, a recommendation is awaited, and then only Mr. Mincin's case will be pending. COMMISSIONER RECOMMENDED, DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL SHALL FILE A CASE CONFERENCE REPORT OR JOINDER ON OR BEFORE MAY 23; SCHEDULING ORDER WILL ISSUE INDICATING EARLIEST AVAILABLE TRIAL SETTING; ANY FAILURE TO COOPERATE IN DISCOVERY AND PLTF. THIEL'S COUNSEL CAN BRING A Motion to Strike. |
|
April 23, 1997 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR DISCOVERY CONFERENCE | |
April 23, 1997 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY CONFERENCE | |
April 07, 1997 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER | |
April 07, 1997 | Docket Event |
STATUS CHECK: CRIMINAL TRIAL COMPLETION Court Clerk: DEBRA VINSON Heard By: Stephen Huffaker Mr. Muije advised the property issue has pretty much been settled and requested the matter be taken OFF CALENDAR, SO ORDERED. |
|
March 28, 1997 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION | |
March 21, 1997 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER | |
March 21, 1997 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER BETWEEN NEIMAN MARCUS AND ALBERT THIEL | |
March 07, 1997 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NITICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION OF JACK ZWERNER | |
March 07, 1997 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF COPY FOR NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION OF JACK ZWERNER | |
March 07, 1997 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION OF JACK ZWERNER | |
March 07, 1997 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
March 05, 1997 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment ALBERT THIEL'S MTN FOR SUM JUDGMENT AND FOR RELEASE OF INTERPLED FUNDS/PROPERTY Relief Clerk: SUE DEATON Heard By: Stephen Huffaker Mr. Darin R. Savage, Deputy District Attorney - Criminal, present for Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. Mr. David Mincin present representing Mr. Albert Thiel. Mr. Mincin advised Court conviction in criminal case is not final. It is not over until the Appeal is over. Court said there would be no stay of criminal judgment; even if there is an Appeal of the criminal judgment, the Court does not stay the judgment. In question is a GMC Suburban and $7,000 cash; Mr. Zwerner allegedly purchased GMC Suburban with funds from criminal activity. Court said it would have to have a Hearing because other parties have claims against property, but this property should be able to be reached before Appeal is over. Mr. Leavitt argued that it was premature; if Supreme Court rules a monetary judgment, then money can remedy that. Court said counsel to get release from other parties who have claims or we will have to have a Hearing. If release from all other parties obtained, prepare and submit Order for Court's signature. Mr. Savage said Metro represented as regards to vehicle. It is being stored and has accrued towing and storage fees. Court said these costs would be taken out. Court informed counsel to get release from everyone they know is involved; give Court Order to sign then serve it upon them, that will suffice. COURT ORDERED ALBERT THIEL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DENIED and ALBERT THIEL'S MOTION FOR RELEASE OF INTERPLED FUNDS/PROPERTY HELD IN ABEYANCE pending signed release of all parties. 4-7-97, 9:00 A.M., STATUS CHECK: CRIMINAL TRIAL COMPLETION |
|
February 26, 1997 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment ALBERT THIEL'S MTN FOR SUM JUDGMENT AND FOR RELEASE OF INTERPLED FUNDS/PROPERTY Relief Clerk: SUE DEATON Heard By: Stephen Huffaker Court had not received a copy of Mr. Leavitt's opposition. Therefore, MATTER CONTINUED. |
|
February 21, 1997 | Docket Event |
Opposition JACK ZWERNER'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND FOR RELEASE OF INTERPLED FUNDS AND PROPERTY |
|
February 03, 1997 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND FOR RELEASE OF INTERPLED FUNDS AND PROPERTY | |
February 03, 1997 | Docket Event |
Motion ALBERT THIEL'S MTN FOR SUM JUDGMENT AND FOR RELEASE OF INTERPLED FUNDS/PROPERTY |
|
January 10, 1997 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NOTICE OF ENTRY OF PARTIAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT |
|
January 09, 1997 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment PARTIAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT (A355021) |
|
December 04, 1996 | Docket Event |
STATUS CHECK: CRIMINAL TRIAL COMPLETION Court Clerk: DEBRA VINSON Heard By: Stephen Huffaker A review of Criminal case revealed Jury Trial date set for March 24, 1997. COURT ORDERED matter set for Status Check after March Trial date. |
|
December 02, 1996 | Docket Event | ORDER IN AID OF EXECUTION | |
November 25, 1996 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PHILIP T VARRICCHIO ESQ IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER IN AID OF EXECUTION | |
November 25, 1996 | Docket Event |
Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER IN AID OF EXECUTION |
|
September 04, 1996 | Docket Event |
STATUS CHECK: CRIMINAL TRIAL COMPLETION Court Clerk: DEBRA VINSON Heard By: Stephen Huffaker Mr. Varricchio advised Court Mr. Zwerner is now scheduled to start a second trial. Mr. Zwerner said he was scheduled for arraignment on September 10, 1996 and that assets and liabilities were a critical part of this upcoming trial. Court informed those present that it did not want to begin proeedings in this case until the Criminal matters have been resolved. COURT ORDERED matter CONTINUED ninety (90) days. |
|
August 23, 1996 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY COMMISSIONERS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS | |
August 14, 1996 | Docket Event |
Objection DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY COMMISSIONERS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS |
|
August 14, 1996 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY COMMISSIONERS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS | |
August 02, 1996 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (A342792) | |
July 29, 1996 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing HEARING RE: SHOW CAUSE CONTEMPT Relief Clerk: SUE DEATON Heard By: Stephen Huffaker Court advised this matter was on Calendar for an Examination of Judgment Debtor; Deft Jack Zwerner sworn in by Clerk. Mr. Varricchio advised Court he was aware Deft currently had some on-going criminal proceedings. Mr. Zwerner read a statement he had prepared advising Court he was currently in the seventh day of a criminal trial and his attorneys had advised him not to make any admissions regarding his financial assets as that could have some bearing on the outcome of the criminal proceedings. COURT ORDERED matter set for a STATUS CHECK. 9-4-96, 9:00 A.M., STATUS CHECK: CRIMINAL TRIAL COMPLETION |
|
July 29, 1996 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type STATUS CHECK: CRIMINAL TRIAL COMPLETION |
|
July 16, 1996 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY CONFERENCE Court Clerk: LARRY SNYDER Heard By: Thomas Biggar James Sweetin, Esq. and David Mincin, Esq. present from consolidated cases A352726 and A355021. Mr. Mincin advised that the criminal Trial is set to go on Monday, and noted that it would best serve the judicial economy; if we waited to see what happens in the criminal case. Mr. Varricchio stated that he heard the criminal Trial was being postponed for six months, and explained that he would like to take the depositions of the Pltf. and the victim, Albert Thiel. Colloquy among Commissioner and Counsel regarding the taking of the Thiel deposition. Mr. Varricchio stated that he is trying to find out where the money is. Statement to the Commissioner by Mr. Sweetin, stating that the property was the proceeds of the theft, and was seized on behalf of the victim; consisting of $7,000 in cash and a GMC vehicle. COMMISSIONER RECOMMENDED, a 16.1 Conference to be set; everybody to be noticed, and if they do not cooperate, their Answers will be Stricken. Mr. Varricchio to set the Conference, and the Case Conference Report to be on file within thirty days. COMMISSIONER FURTHER RECOMMENDED, deposition of Albert Thiel may proceed the filing of the Case Conference Report, or the holding of the Conference; if taken subsequent of the criminal Trial; assuming that it goes next week; otherwise, it will be done in the ordinary course. Mr. Varricchio to prepare the Recommendation. |
|
July 15, 1996 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY CONFERENCE | |
July 03, 1996 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF FACSIMILE TRANSMISSION | |
July 03, 1996 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT | |
July 03, 1996 | Docket Event | DEFAULT (A355021) | |
July 02, 1996 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR DISCOVERY CONFERENCE | |
June 27, 1996 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION | |
June 25, 1996 | Docket Event |
Motion HEARING RE: SHOW CAUSE CONTEMPT |
|
June 25, 1996 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
June 11, 1996 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
June 04, 1996 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR | |
June 04, 1996 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR | |
June 04, 1996 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR | |
May 22, 1996 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL | |
May 17, 1996 | Docket Event |
Order to Withdraw as Attorney of Record ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL |
|
May 15, 1996 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw as Counsel MICHAEL H. SINGER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD Court Clerk: MELISSA DAVIS Heard By: Stephen Huffaker There being no opposition to motion, COURT ORDERED, motion GRANTED. LATER: Mr. Singer appeared and was notified of the Court's ruling. |
|
May 10, 1996 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | |
April 26, 1996 | Docket Event |
Motion MICHAEL H. SINGER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD |
|
April 12, 1996 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
April 12, 1996 | Docket Event |
Notice of Early Case Conference RESCHEDULED NOTICE OF EARLY CASE CONFERENCE |
|
April 11, 1996 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING | |
April 11, 1996 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FOR ORDER OF PUBLICATION | |
April 11, 1996 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF FORFEITURE ACTION | |
March 22, 1996 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF EARLY CASE CONFERENCE | |
March 13, 1996 | Docket Event | ORDER - A352726 - A355021 | |
March 04, 1996 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO MICHAEL A KAPLAN'S COUNTERCLAIM (A355021) | |
February 23, 1996 | Docket Event |
Motion ALL PENDING MOTIONS |
|
February 21, 1996 | Docket Event |
ALL PENDING MOTIONS Court Clerk: BERNIECE STUCKI Heard By: Stephen Huffaker PLAINTIFF'S Motion to Strike WRIT OF ATTACHMENT GARNISHMENT AND EXECUTION... LV METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT'S Motion to Consolidate WITH #A352726 AND #A355021 RICHARD MCKNIGHT, Esq. present for case A352726. Mr. McKnight argued this case has gone to judgment and should not be on calendar. Based on represen- tations of Mr. Muije and Mr. O'Callaghan, COURT ORDERED, this case and cases A352726 and A355021 will be consolidated and will remain in Dept. Nine since the lower case number is in this Department. FURTHER ORDERED, plaintiff's Motion to Strike Writ of Attachment Garnishment and Execution is continued to the same time as the Status Check set for April 24, 1996. 4-24-96 9:00 AM STATUS CHECK and PLAINTIFF'S Motion to Strike |
|
February 21, 1996 | Docket Event |
Motion to Consolidate LV METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPT'S Motion to Consolidate WITH #A352726 AND #A355021 Heard By: Stephen Huffaker |
|
February 21, 1996 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike PLNTF'S Motion to Strike WRIT OF ATTACHMENT GARNISHMENT AND EXECUTION |
|
February 13, 1996 | Docket Event | REPLY TO ALBERT THIEL'S OPPOSITION TO Motion to Strike WRIT OF ATTACHMENTGARNISHMENT AMD EXECUTION REPLY TO ALBERT THIEL'S OPPOSITION TO Motion to Consolidate REPLY TO NEIMAN MARCUS' RESPONSE TO DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION AND REPLY TO NEIMAN MARCUS OPPOSITION TO Motion to Strike WRIT OF ATTACHMENT GARNISHMENT AND EXECUTION | |
February 09, 1996 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO Motion to Consolidate | |
February 09, 1996 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S Motion to Consolidate | |
February 09, 1996 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO Motion to Strike WRIT OF ATTACHMENT GARNISHMENT AND EXECUTION | |
January 25, 1996 | Docket Event |
Motion PLNTF'S Motion to Strike WRIT OF ATTACHMENT GARNISHMENT AND EXECUTION |
|
January 25, 1996 | Docket Event |
Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND Motion to Strike WRIT OF ATTACHMENT GARNISHMENT AND EXECUTION |
|
January 24, 1996 | Docket Event |
Motion LV METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPT'S Motion to Consolidate WITH #A352726 AND #A355021 |
|
January 19, 1996 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION | |
January 17, 1996 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
January 16, 1996 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION | |
January 11, 1996 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
December 06, 1995 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR | |
December 05, 1995 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR | |
December 05, 1995 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR | |
November 13, 1995 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION | |
November 09, 1995 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
October 25, 1995 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
August 23, 1995 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR | |
August 21, 1995 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR | |
August 21, 1995 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR | |
July 07, 1995 | Docket Event |
Notice of Bankruptcy NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY |
|
June 05, 1995 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
June 05, 1995 | Docket Event |
Judgment DEFAULT JUDGMENT PLUS INTEREST |
|
May 26, 1995 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type REASSIGN CASE FROM JUDGE MAUPIN TO JUDGE HUFFAKER |
|
May 26, 1995 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT REASSIGNMENT 002419FC 002419 | |
May 25, 1995 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER RE: DEPT. VII Court Clerk: LARRY SNYDER Heard By: A. William Maupin To avoid the appearance of impropriety and implied bias, this Court hereby disqualifies itself and ORDERS, this matter be REASSIGNED at random. |
|
May 25, 1995 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type MINUTE ORDER RE: DEPT. VII |
|
May 16, 1995 | Docket Event |
Summons AMENDED SUMMONS |
|
May 05, 1995 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
March 13, 1995 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS | |
March 09, 1995 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS | |
March 09, 1995 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
February 21, 1995 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
February 14, 1995 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED Fee $126.00 |