Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lopez, Alexander, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Pro Se, against Nevada State Of, represented by Katrina Ann Samuels, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Adair, Valerie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 02, 2019 |
CategoryWrit Of Habeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeClerk'S Certificate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion State's Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Reconsider |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Reconsider The State present via Blue Jeans. The Court noted that the Defendant was currently in State custody, and was requesting an Order from the Court. The State advised that it was not served with the instant Motion, but had been able to review it, along with the letter from the Federal Public Defender. Additionally, the State represented that it wished to forward the Motion to the Appellate Division for investigation. COURT ORDERED Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider, was hereby CONTINUED, to allow the Appellate Division to review the Motion. The Court REQUESTED the State look into the Federal Public Defender's letter, and determine whether an Order was needed for the December 8, 2020, hearing. CONTINUED TO: 3/11/2021 8:30 AM CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was mailed to: Alexander Lopez #94856 [Southern Desert Correctional Center P.O. Box 208 Indian Springs, NV 89070]. (KD 2/11/21) Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Reconsider The State present via Blue Jeans. The Court noted that the Defendant was currently in State custody, and was requesting an Order from the Court. The State advised that it was not served with the instant Motion, but had been able to review it, along with the letter from the Federal Public Defender. Additionally, the State represented that it wished to forward the Motion to the Appellate Division for investigation. COURT ORDERED Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider, was hereby CONTINUED, to allow the Appellate Division to review the Motion. The Court REQUESTED the State look into the Federal Public Defender's letter, and determine whether an Order was needed for the December 8, 2020, hearing. CONTINUED TO: 3/11/2021 8:30 AM CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was mailed to: Alexander Lopez #94856 [Southern Desert Correctional Center P.O. Box 208 Indian Springs, NV 89070]. (KD 2/11/21) Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Department Reassignment | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Reconsider | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Opposition to State's Response to Defendant's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.