Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In the Matter of the Petition of Delila Cruz
An Other Civil Filings (Petition) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV. Judge Earley, Kerry presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 23, 2020
Last Refreshed
November 06, 2023
Filing Location
Clark County, NV
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Krall, Nadia;Category
Other Civil Filings (Petition)
Case Outcome Type
Order Approving Minor's Compromise
Status
Stipulated Judgment
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Doc ID# 4 [4] Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account Matter heard. Proof filed. CLERK S NOTE: Counsel are to ensure a copy of the forgoing minute order is distributed to all interested parties; additionally, a copy of the foregoing minute order was distributed to the registered service recipients via Odyssey eFileNV E-Service (1/26/21 np). Judge: Krall, Nadia |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change Judicial Reassignment to Judge Nadia Krall Judge: ChangeJudicial Reassignment to Judge Nadia Krall |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Establishment of Blocked Trust Account Doc ID# 3 [3] Proof of Blocked Trust |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Establishment of Blocked Trust Account Proof of Blocked Trust |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Doc ID# 2 [2] ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Doc ID# 1 [1] PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR |