Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jackson, Rosemary, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Rebecca H Miller, against Jackson, Michael D, represented by John A. Piet, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Terrance P. Marren presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2008 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Decree of Divorce |
|
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Decree of Divorce | |
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings Re: Duration of Life Insurance policy Judge: Thompson, Charles |
|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Trial Vacated - per Judge Judge: Pomrenze, Sandra) Vacated - per JudgeVacated 4/10/09, matter settled and divorce granted (dsb/cc |
|
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference (Sr. Judge Terrance Marren) Judge: Pomrenze, Sandra) (Sr. Judge Terrance Marren |
|
March 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Order Setting Civil Non-Jury Trial | |
December 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department E to Department P |
|
September 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Service - Financial Disclosure Form And Answer And Counterclaim For Divorce |
|
September 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Financial Disclosure Form Michael Dennis Jackson |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.