Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ashe, Kimberly, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Pamela L. Smith-Steward presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time158 days |
Trial Brief (Opening Brief) filed.
Date: 2012-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment Sac generated .
Date: 2012-07-13T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Relating Case to 34-2011-80000993) filed.
Date: August 27, 2012Request - Other (Request for Administrative Record) filed.
Date: 2012-08-02T00:00:00Judgment (Denying Cconsolidated Writ Petitions) filed.
Date: November 02, 2012Opposition (Brief) filed.
Date: 2012-08-23T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2012-08-20T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate filed.
Date: 2012-07-13T00:00:00Court's Tentative Ruling
Date: September 13, 2012Tentative Ruling
Date: September 13, 2012Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.
Date: 2012-07-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-07-13T00:00:00Application - Other (Petitioner's Ex Parte Application for Expedited Hearing) filed.
Date: 2012-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Hearing filed.
Date: 2012-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Related Case filed.
Date: 2012-08-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 11/02/2012 04:06:00 PM .
Date: November 02, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.