Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Gill Evelynia Vs Cruz Lenni
An Auto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hudson County, NJ. Judge Veronica Allende presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 26, 2023
Last Refreshed
August 14, 2023
Filing Location
Hudson County, NJ
Category
Auto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Open
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by PATEL, PATRICK, G of PATRICK G. PATEL on behalf of EVELYNIA GILL against LENNI J CRUZ, TERESA N BENNETT, HELLEN BOCHERE ONDERI, JOHN DOE | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by PATEL, PATRICK, G of PATRICK G. PATEL on behalf of EVELYNIA GILL against LENNI J CRUZ, TERESA N BENNETT, HELLEN BOCHERE ONDERI, JOHN DOE | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for HUD-L-002273-23 submitted by PATEL, PATRICK G, PATRICK G. PATEL on behalf of EVELYNIA GILL against LENNI J CRUZ, TERESA N BENNETT, HELLEN BOCHERE ONDERI, JOHN DOE |