Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In The Matter Of Singh Hirsch
An Other case was filed in the jurisdiction of Hudson County, NJ. Judge Peter F. Bariso presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 24, 2020
Last Refreshed
August 09, 2023
Filing Location
Hudson County, NJ
Category
Other
Case Outcome Type
Transferred To Another County
Status
Transfer
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Case Documents
Order To Transfer To Another Venue - GRANTED by Judge MINKOWITZ, STUART, A
Date: Sep 09, 2020Reply Brief uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by HIRSCH SINGH
Date: Aug 05, 2020Order For Discovery - PARTIAL by Judge JABLONSKI, JEFFREY, R
Date: Jul 31, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Order To Transfer To Another Venue - GRANTED by Judge MINKOWITZ, STUART, A | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Reply Brief uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by HIRSCH SINGH | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: Complaint [LCV20201325989] -Telephonic Oral Argument is scheduled with Judge Bariso for August 7, 2020 at 11:00 am. Call-in information: Dial In Number - 866-390-1828 Access Code - 2039598 | |
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by GLEESON, STEVEN, MICHAEL of ATTORNEY GENERAL LAW on behalf of HUDSON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIO against HIRSCH SINGH | |
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: Complaint [LCV20201325989] -Telephonic Oral Argument is scheduled for 8/7 at 11:00 am with Judge Peter F\. Bariso Jr. Parties are to set up teleconference and provide call-in information to the court. | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Order For Discovery - PARTIAL by Judge JABLONSKI, JEFFREY, R | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for HUD-L-002768-20 submitted by HIRSH SINGH, on behalf of HIRSCH SINGH against E. JUNIOR MALDONADO, HUDSON COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIO, COUNTY BOARD OF CANVASSERS |