Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Mohammed Naufal Vs Great Expressions De Ntal Cen
A Medical Malpractice case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hudson County, NJ. Judge Peter F Bariso Jr presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 22, 2019
Last Refreshed
July 28, 2023
Filing Location
Hudson County, NJ
Category
Medical Malpractice
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Malpractice
Case Outcome Type
Dismissed Rule 1:13-7
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Oct 17, 2020LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Aug 15, 2020TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Nov 27, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2020 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | CORRECTION-LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 15, 2020 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by NAUFAL MOHAMMED | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for HUD-L-004597-19 submitted by NAUFAL MOHAMMED , on behalf of NAUFAL MOHAMMED against GREAT EXPRESSIONS DENTAL CENTE, AMALGAMATED DENTAL CENTER PC, ROTHSTEIN JEFFREY DMD, STEVEN REFF DDS, JOHN AND JANE DOES, M.D. A THR ET AL. |