Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
RDJ BUILDERS LLC vs ORTIZ GABRIELLA et al
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Dona Ana County, NM. Judge Lisa C. Schultz presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 04, 2011
Last Refreshed
October 06, 2022
Filing Location
Dona Ana County, NM
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
CLS: STIPULATED DISMISSAL Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal - |
|
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FINDINGS, CONCL OF LAW Defendants/Counter-Claimants Requested Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law |
|
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION/OPPOSITION Notice of Objections to Plaintiffs Exhibits |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION/OPPOSITION Plaintiff's Objection to Certain Defense Exhibits 36pgs |
|
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANEOUS ENTRY Log Notes of 4.21.14 Entry of Pre Trial Order Hearing / Gale Simpson 14 pgs |
|
April 21, 2014 | hearing |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Schneider, Angie K. |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORD: ORDER PRE-TRIAL ORDER 2pgs |
|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT LIST Amended (Revised) |
|
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST Plaintiff's Amended Witness List |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT LIST Plaintiff's Amended Exhibit List |
|
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
NTC: NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING Pre-Trial Order |
|
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
NTC: NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING Bench Trial |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
REPLY to Counter-Claimants Memorandum of Authority on the Issue of Their Counterclaims |
|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM Counter-Claimants Memorandum of Authority on the Issue of Their Counter-Claims |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR HEARING/ SETTING Request for Setting By Telephone |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
TAPE & LOG RECEIPT Tape Log of 2.21.14 hearing |
|
February 20, 2014 | hearing |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Schneider, Angie K. |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORD: OF CONTINUANCE ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR HEARING/ SETTING Final Hearing/Non-Jury |
|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR HEARING/ SETTING Pre-Trial Hearing on all Motions |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORD: OF CONTINUANCE ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE To be Rescheduled for a Pre-trial Hearing |
|
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR HEARING/ SETTING Request for setting on Motion for Continuance - 2 pgs |
|
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
MTN: FOR CONTINUANCE Motion for Continuance - 2 pgs |
|
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
NTC: HEARING Notice of Setting - Hearing to be heard on 2/4/14 09:00 AM Re: Final Hearing - Time alloted - 1Day |
|
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORD: ORDER GRANTING Order Granting Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel - John E. Keithly is granted to leave to withdraw as attny of record for RDJ Builders 2pgs |
|
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
NTC: NOTICE Notice of Substitution of Counsel; Keith John is Substituted by Olbert Coldwell as Counce for Plaintiff, RDJ Builders LLC - 1pg |
|
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
MTN: TO WITHDRAW Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel 2pgs |
|
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR HEARING/ SETTING Request for Setting Matter to be heard: Defts counter claim |
|
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
MTN: FOR CONTINUANCE Motion for Continuance |
|
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORD: OF CONTINUANCE Order Granting Continuance; trial set for 4/24/13 is vacated |
|
April 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service -- copy/Subpoena srvd on John Trujillo on 04/08/13 -- 2 pgs | |
March 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
NTC: HEARING Notice of Hearing -- Merits -- 04/24/13 @ 9am before Jdg Brogan -- 1 pg |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
MTN: MOTION Motion to Reschedule Trial on an Expedited Basis |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
NTC: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY Notice of bankruptcy filed by Oralia B. Franco 1 PG |
|
December 04, 2012 | hearing |
MOTION HEARING
Judge: Brogan, William H. |
|
October 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR DEFINITE SETTING ON PENDING MOTIONS AND FOR ENLARGEMENT OF THE TIME FOR TRIAL - JOHN E KEITHLY OBO PLAINTIFF 4 PGS |
|
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR DEFINITE SETTING ON PENDING MOTIONS AND FOR ENLARGEMENT OF THE TIME FOR TRIAL - JOHN E KEITHLY OBO PLTF 4 PGS |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR HEARING/ SETTING REQUEST FOR SETTING MATTERS TO BE HEARD: PENDING MOTIONS SUBMITTED BY: HERMAN E. ORTIZ OBO RESPT 1 PG |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
MTN: MOTION MOTION FOR DEFINITE SETTING ON PENDING MOTIONS AND FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME FOR TRIAL - HERMAN ORTIZ obo DEFTs 2 PGS |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR HEARING/ SETTING REQUEST FOR SETTING MATTERS TO BE HEARD: JURY TRIAL/CNTR CLAIMS SUBMITTED BY: HERMAN E. ORTIZ obo DEFTs RE: RDJ BUILDERS vs ORTIZ etal 1 PG |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
NTC: HEARING AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING // 12-04-12 @ 9AM Motion to Strike JURY DEMAND; MERITS; AMENDED COMPLAINT & COUNTERCLAIM 2 PGS |
|
October 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
NTC: HEARING (CIVIL) NOTICE OF HEARING - JUDGE: WILLIAM H BROGAN MATTHER TO BE HEARD: MNT TO STRIKE JURY DEMAND; MERITS; AMENDED COMPLAINT & COUNTERCLAIM DATE: 12/04/12 TIME: 9:00 A.M. ALLOCATED TIME: ONE DAY PACE:DAC COURTHOUSE, 201 W PICACHO AVE, LAS CRUCES, NM 88005 1 PG |
|
August 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR HEARING/ SETTING REQUEST FOR SETTING MATTERS TO BE HEARD: AMENDED COMPLAINT SUBMITTED BY: JOHN E KEITHLY 1 PG |
|
August 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR HEARING/ SETTING REQUEST FOR SETTING MATTERS TO BE HEARD: MNT TO STRIKE JURY DEMAND SUBMITTED BY: JOHN E KEITHLY 1 PG |
|
August 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORD: ORDER SUA PONTE ORDER GRANGING PLAINTIFF'S Motion to Strike JURY DEMAND - PLTFS Motion to Strike JURY DEMAND FILED ON 07/18/2012 IS GRANTED - 2 PGS |
|
August 10, 2012 | Docket Event | REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO Motion to Strike JURY DEMAND // JOHN E. KEITHLY OBO PLNT 4 PGS | |
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
NTC: OF NON-AVAILABILITY NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY // 08-01-12 - 08-16-12 HERMAN E. ORTIZ 1 PG |
|
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO Motion to Strike JURY DEMAND // HERMAN E. ORTIZ OBO DEFT 2 PGS | |
July 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
MTN: MOTION Motion to Strike JURY DEMAND - JOHN F. KEITHLY OBO PLNTF 4PGS |
|
July 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM ANSWER TO DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIM - JOHN F. KEITHLY OBO PLNTF 4PGS |
|
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
MTN: TO WITHDRAW NOTICE TO WITHDRAW MOTION // JOHN E. KEITHLY OBO PLNT 2 PGS |
|
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
MTN: MOTION/APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT - JOHN E KEITHLY OBO PLAINTIFF RDJ BUILDERS LLC 2 PGS |
|
July 05, 2012 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT/COUNTER-CLAIM AS TO COUNT II OF AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - HERMAN ORTIZ, PROSE & ATTY for GABRIELA ORTIZ 4 PGS | |
June 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORD: ORDER ORDER - PLAINTIFF SHALL BE GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT UPON THE ENTRY OF THIS ORDER 3 PGS |
|
June 20, 2012 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT - JOHN E KEITHLY OBO PLAINTIFF RDJ BUILDERS LLC 42 PGS | |
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORD: ORDER ORDER - 1 PLTF GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT UPON ENTRY OF THIS ORDER & W/IN TIME SPECIFIED IN RULE 1-015 NMRA 2 & 3 ISSUES AS STATED 3 PGS |
|
May 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
TAP: MOTION HEARING: MOTION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT DATE: 5/17/12 MONITOR: PHYLLIS J. STARR CRT RM #: OTER DIV IV COURTROOM JDG: WILLIAM H. BROGAN CD: 12-694 RE: RDJ BUILDER, V HERMAN ORTIZ, ET AL, |
|
May 17, 2012 | hearing |
HEARING
Judge: Brogan, William H. |
|
April 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
NTC: HEARING (CIVIL) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - MATTHER TO BE HEARD: AMEND HEARING FROM COMPLAINT FOR FORCIBLE DETAINER (CONTINUATION OF 02/09/2012 HEARING) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT & FOR SEPARATE TIRAL OF COUNTERCLAIM. DATE/TIME: 05/17/2012 09:00 AM TIME ALLOTED: 2 HOURS PLACE: OTERO COUNTY COURTHOUSE 1000 NEW YORK AVE ALAMOGORDO, NM 88310 1 PG |
|
April 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
NTC: HEARING (CIVIL) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - MATTER TO BE HEARD: COMPLAINT FOR FORCIBLE DETAINER TO: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FOR SEPARATE TRIAL OF COUNTERCLAIM. DATE: 05/17/2012 TIME: 09:00 AM 2 HOURS ALLOTED PLACE: OTERO COUNTY COURTHOUSE.1000 NEW YORK AVE. ALAMOGORDO NM 88310 3 FAXED PGS |
|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO BIFURCATE TRIAL - HERMAN E. ORTIZ PRO SE 3 PGS | |
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR HEARING/ SETTING REQUEST FOR SETTING MATTERS TO BE HEARD: MTN FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FOR SEPARATE TRIAL OF COUNTERCLAIM SUBMITTED BY: JOHN E KEITHLY OBO PLTF 1 PG |
|
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
MTN: FOR LEAVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FOR SEPARATE TRIAL OF COUNTERCLAIM JOHN E. KEITHLY OBO PLNT PGS: 9 |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
NTC: HEARING (CIVIL) NOTICE OF HEARING MATTER TO BE HEARD: COMPLAINT FOR FORCIBLE DETAINER DATE/TIME: 5/17/12 @ 9:00 AM BY: DOROTHY MURPHY PGS: 1 |
|
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
TAP: HEARING HEARING: COMPLAINT FOR FORCIBLE RETAINER DATE: 2/9/12 MONITOR: MELODY LONGWILL CRT RM: CR 3 JDG: WILLIAM H. BROGAN CD: 12-175 RE: RDJ BUILDERS, LLC. V. |
|
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT RECEIPT RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS RCVD FROM: MELODY LONGWILL HRG DATE: 02-09-12 REC'V/ CHECKED IN BY: VANGIE C PLNTF/PLTF EXHIBITS:1-9 DEFT/RSPNDT EXHIBITS:0 1 PG |
|
February 09, 2012 | hearing |
HEARING
Judge: Brogan, William H. |
|
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORD: ORDER DENYING DENIAL OF Motion for Continuance: -Motion for Continuance of FEB 9, 2012 Hearing is DENIED 1 PG **FILED IN OPEN COURT** |
|
February 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
MTN: FOR CONTINUANCE Motion for Continuance ATTRY: HERMAN E. ORTIZ OBO DEFT PGS: 2 |
|
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORD: ORDER DENYING ORDER DENYING MOTION TO VACATE // THIS MATTER WILL BE HEARD ONLY AS TO THE FORCIBLE ENTRY AND UNLAWFUL DETAINER ISSUES ON 02-09-12 @ 1:30PM REQUEST TO COMPEL THE PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE SCHEDULING ORDER WILL BE HEARD AT A LATER TIME, 1 PG |
|
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
NTC: HEARING (REQUEST AND NOTICE) 2ND AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: COMPLAINT/FORCIBLE DETAINER - SET BEFORE THE HONORABLE WILLIAM H BROGAN ON 02-09-12 @ 1:30 PM 1 PG |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
MTN: TO VACATE MOTION TO VACATE TRIAL SETTING AND TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SCHEDULING ORDER - HERMAN E ORTIZ 2 PGS |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR HEARING/ SETTING REQUEST FOR SETTING/HEARING MATTERS TO BE HEARD: MOTION TO VACATE TRIAL AND COMPEL SUBMITTED BY: HERMAN E ORTIZ RE: 1 PG |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
NTC: HEARING AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - PARIES TO APPEAR BEFORE THE HONORABLE WILLIAM H BROGAN ON 02-09-12 @ 10 AM **FILED IN OPEN COURT** 1 PG |
|
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
NTC: HEARING (CIVIL) NOTICE OF HEARING - COMPLAINT FOR FORCIBLE DETAINER BEFORE THE HONORABLE WILILAM H BROGAN ON 02-09-12 @ 10 AM FILED IN OPEN COURT 1 PG |
|
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | REPLY TO RESPONSE - MOTION TO DISMISS - JOHN E. KEITHLY OBO PLNTF 6 PGS | |
November 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE COUNTER CLAIMANTS RESPONSE TO COUNTER DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS - HERMAN E ORTIZ OBO DEFTS 4 PGS |
|
November 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
MTN: TO DISMISS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM AND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM - JOHN KEITHLY OBO PLTF 4 PGS |
|
October 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
ANSWER & COUNTERCLAIM ANSWER AND FIRST AMENDED COUNTER-CLAIM AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL // HERMAN E. ORTIZ DEFTPRO SE AND ATTY FOR GABRIELA ORTIZ DEFT PRO SE 6 PGS |
|
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Entire file w/Case History and this Certificate were MAILED on OCT 6, 2011 to JUDGE WILLIAM H. BROGAN 1 PG | |
October 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
JDG: SUPREME COURT ORDER DESIGNATING JUDGE SUPREME COURT/ORDER DESIGNATING JUDGE - The HONORABLE WILLIAM H. BROGAN, Twelfth Jud/District is DESIGNATED 2 PGS |
|
October 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
JDG: NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT FILING NTC: JUDGE ASSIGNMENT BEFORE THE HONORABLE WILLIAM H BROGAN ON HERMAN ORTIZ |
|
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE CLERKS CERTIFICATE - Copy of the Complaint & Recusals for ALL AVAILABLE DISTRICT COURT JUDGES sent to SUPREME COURT For DESIGNATION ON: SEPT 30, 2011 2 PGS |
|
September 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
JDG: NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT FILING NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT; CASE NOT ASSIGNED: WAIT SUPREME COURT DESIGNATION DUE TO RECUSAL OF JUDGE LISA C SCHULTZ ON HERMAN ORTIZ RE: RDJ BUILDERS LLC etal vs HERMAN ORTIZ etal NOTE: PARTIES HAVE 10 WORKING DAYS TO AGREE TO A JUDGE & HAVE THAT JUDGE ACCEPT THIS CASE/OTHERWISE WILL BE SENT TO THE SUPREME COURT FOR DESIGNATION ON: SEPT 30, 2011 |
|
September 15, 2011 | Docket Event | JDG: JUDGE ASSIGN RECUSAL | |
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
JDG: JUDGE RECUSAL NOTICE OF RECUSAL - JUDGE LISA C. SCHULTZ recuses 1 PG RE: RDJ BUILDERS LLC etal vs HERMAN ORTIZ etal NOTE: PARTIES HAVE 10 WORKING DAYS TO AGREE TO A JUDGE & HAVE THAT JUDGE ACCEPT THIS CASE/OTHERWISE WILL BE REASSIGNED ON: SEPT 15, 2011 |
|
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event | JDG: JUDGE ASSIGN RECUSAL | |
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
JDG: NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT FILING NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT; CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE LISA C SCHULTZ DUE TO RECUSAL OF JUDGE SUSAN M RIEDEL ON HERMAN ORTIZ |
|
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
ANSWER & COUNTERCLAIM ANSWER AND COUNTER-CLAIM DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL HERMAN E. ORTIZ DEFT PRO SE AND OBO GABRIELA ORTIZ DEFT 4 PGS |
|
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
JDG: NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT FILING NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT; CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SUSAN M RIEDEL DUE TO RECUSAL OF JUDGE JACINTO PALOMINO ON HERMAN ORTIZ |
|
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
JDG: JUDGE RECUSAL NOTICE OF RECUSAL - The HONORABLE SUSAN M. RIEDEL recuses 1 PG RE: RDJ BUILDERS, LLC vs HERMANE E. ORTIZ etal NOTE: PARTIES HAVE 10 WORKING DAYS TO AGREE TO A JUDGE & HAVE THAT JUDGE ACCEPT THIS CASE/OTHERWISE WILL BE REASSIGNED ON: AUG 25, 2011 |
|
August 09, 2011 | Docket Event | JDG: JUDGE ASSIGN RECUSAL | |
July 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
JDG: JUDGE RECUSAL NOTICE OF RECUSAL - JUDGE JACINTO PALOMINO recuses 1 PG RE: RDJ BUILDERS LLC vs HERMANE E. ORTIZ etal NOTE: PARTIES HAVE 10 WORKING DAYS TO AGREE TO A JUDGE & HAVE THAT JUDGE ACCEPT THIS CASE/OTHERWISE WILL BE REASSIGNED ON: AUG 9, 2011 |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER AND TO COMPEL MEDIATION - JOHN E KEITHLY OBO PLAINTIFF 10 PGS | |
June 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
MTN: TO DISMISS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER AND TO COMPEL MEDIATION - HERMAN E ORTIZ, PRO SE & OBO GABRIELA ORTIZ 3 PGS |
|
May 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
JDG: NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT FILING NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT; CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JACINTO PALOMINO DUE TO RECUSAL OF JUDGE FERNANDO R MACIAS ON HERMAN ORTIZ |
|
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event | JDG: JUDGE ASSIGN RECUSAL | |
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
JDG: JUDGE RECUSAL NOTICE OF RECUSAL: JUDGE FERNANDO R. MACIAS recuses 1 PG RE: RDJ BUILDERS LLC vs HERMAN ORTIZ etal NOTE: PARTIES HAVE 10 WORKING DAYS TO AGREE TO A JUDGE & HAVE THAT JUDGE ACCEPT THIS CASE/OTHERWISE WILL BE REASSIGNED ON: MAY 16, 2011 |
|
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event | JDG: JUDGE ASSIGN RECUSAL | |
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
JDG: NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT FILING NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT; CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FERNANDO R MACIAS DUE TO RECUSAL OF JUDGE DOUGLAS R DRIGGERS ON HERMAN ORTIZ |
|
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
JDG: JUDGE RECUSAL NOTICE OF RECUSAL: The HONORABLE DROUGLAS R. DRIGGERS recuses 1 PG RE: RDJ BUILDERS LLC vs HERMAN ORTIZ etal NOTE: PARTIES HAVE 10 WORKING DAYS TO AGREE TO A JUDGE & HAVE THAT JUDGE ACCEPT THIS CASE/OTHERWISE WILL BE REASSIGNED ON: APRIL 14, 2011 |
|
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
JDG: NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT FILING NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT; CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DOUGLAS R DRIGGERS DUE TO RECUSAL OF JUDGE MANUEL I ARRIETA ON HERMAN ORTIZ |
|
March 24, 2011 | Docket Event | JDG: JUDGE ASSIGN RECUSAL | |
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
JDG: JUDGE RECUSAL NOTICE OF RECUSAL: JUDGE MANUEL I. ARRIETA recuses 1 PG RE: RDJ BUILDERS LLC vs HERMAN ORTIZ etal NOTE: PARTIES HAVE 10 WORKING DAYS TO AGREE TO A JUDGE & HAVE THAT JUDGE ACCEPT THIS CASE/OTHERWISE WILL BE REASSIGNED ON: MARCH 24, 2011 |
|
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
JDG: NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT FILING NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT; CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MANUEL I ARRIETA DUE TO RECUSAL OF JUDGE JAMES T MARTIN ON HERMAN ORTIZ |
|
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event | JDG: JUDGE ASSIGN RECUSAL | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
JDG: JUDGE RECUSAL NOTICE OF RECUSAL: JUDGE JAMES T. MARTIN recuses 1 PG RE: RDJ BUILDERS LLC vs HERMAN E ORTIZ etal NOTE: PARTIES HAVE 10 WORKING DAYS TO AGREE TO A JUDGE & HAVE THAT JUDGE ACCEPT THIS CASE/OTHERWISE WILL BE REASSIGNED ON: MARCH 3, 2011 |
|
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
DCM (Differentiated Case Management) Scheduling Order ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORTS AND A DISCOVERY PLAN AND LIMITING STIPULATIONS TO ENLARGE TIME FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS (4 PGS) |
|
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
OPN: COMPLAINT COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE DETAINER - JOHN E KEITHLY OBO PLAINTIFF RDJ BUILDERS LLC 46 PGS |