Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Shameem Chowdhury v. Nationstar Mortgage Llc, Robertson, Auschutz, Schneid, Crane & Partners, Pllc, Alicia A Bourne A/K/A ALICIA BOURNE, Gemel Cunningham
A Real Property - Other (Contract Specific Perform) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Ingrid Joseph presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 16, 2022
Last Refreshed
October 12, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Category
Real Property - Other (Contract Specific Perform)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
EXHIBIT(S) - L
Date: Aug 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - M
Date: Aug 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Aug 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Aug 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Aug 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Aug 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: Aug 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Aug 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Aug 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Aug 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D
Date: Aug 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - H
Date: Aug 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - G
Date: Aug 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - J
Date: Aug 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - K
Date: Aug 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 01, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Aug 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E
Date: Aug 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - I
Date: Aug 01, 2023NOTICE
Date: Jul 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Apr 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Apr 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Apr 04, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 20 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 14 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 15 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 19 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 21 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 18 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 17 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 13 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 22 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 23 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 24 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 26 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 25 (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 03, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Apr 03, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED) Corrected
Date: Jan 09, 2023CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS
Date: Jan 09, 2023SUMMONS
Date: Nov 16, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: Nov 16, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: Nov 16, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE For Plaintiffs In person Appearance - Supplementary Oral Arguments in Writing for 08/22/2023 Hearing For Plaintiffs In person Appearance - Supplementary Oral Arguments in Writing for 08/22/2023 Hearing ... show more |
||
August 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L Plaintiffs request for Settlement - Email Correspondences |
||
August 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M Respondents Threats and Intimidation Tactics - Email Correspondences |
||
August 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C |
||
August 21, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of Mailing |
||
August 21, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Reply Affirmation |
||
August 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Certificate of Title |
||
August 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Corporation Search |
||
August 01, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
August 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Names & Signatures On The Memorandum of Sale Page of the Terms of Sale |
||
August 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Terms of Sale |
||
August 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Email correspondence with Plaintiffs Attorney after I received the phone call from the court and Jud Email correspondence with Plaintiffs Attorney after I received the phone call from the court and Jud ... show more |
||
August 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Plaintiffs office sent the letters to Shameem Chowdhury (the purchaser) as a reminder to close. |
||
August 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Initial email correspondence with Plaintiff for obtaining Title Clearance |
||
August 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H First OSC Motion #5 filed by My Attorney Morris Fateha at the time, under Index. No. 508668/2014 |
||
August 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G ACRIS Records and Cover page of Loan Modification Documents |
||
August 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J Reply to opposition papers on Motion #6 |
||
August 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K WebCivil Supreme Court Appearance Detail |
||
August 01, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 01, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Requesting for an in person hearing date. |
||
August 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E The additional closing cost + fees being requested by Plaintiffs prior to closing |
||
August 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I Second OSC Motion #6 filed under Index. No. 508668/2014 |
||
July 31, 2023 |
NOTICE Part 83 Rules -- Motion Day Team's Link |
||
April 04, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC Served via Secretary of State |
||
April 04, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Defendant Robertson, Anshutz, Schneid, Crane |
||
April 04, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 03, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation in Support |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #1) 8 - The Email Correspondence. |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) 1 - The Foreclosure Summons & Complaint |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) 3 - The 2019 Notice of Sale |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) 2 - The Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale, together with Notice of Entry and Affirmation of Service |
||
April 03, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #1) 7 - The Order Extending Time to Close |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #1) 6 -Loan Modification Agreement. |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #1) 5 - WebCivil Supreme Appearance Detail |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #1) 4 - The Terms of Sale |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #1) 10 - Nationstars signed Order to Show Cause. |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion #1) 16 - Plaintiffs signed Order to Show Cause with TRO Stricken. |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 20 (Motion #1) 20 - The Order Denying the Second Order to Show Cause with Notice of Entry |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 14 (Motion #1) 14 - The Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Appeal |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 15 (Motion #1) 15 - 2022 Notice of Sale |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 19 (Motion #1) 19 - Plaintiffs signed Second Order to Show Cause with TRO Stricken |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 21 (Motion #1) 21 - Referee's Deed |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 18 (Motion #1) 18 - Referees Report of Sale |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 17 (Motion #1) 17 - Order Denying Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 13 (Motion #1) 13 - The Notice of Appeal |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 22 (Motion #1) 22 - The Summons |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 23 (Motion #1) 23 - Complaint |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #1) 11 - Order Holding Purchaser In Default. |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #1) 9 - Time of the Essence Letter |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion #1) 12 - The Notice of Entry of the Order Holding Purchaser In Default and Affirmation of Service |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 24 (Motion #1) 24 - The Notice of Pendency |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 26 (Motion #1) 26 - The Amended Notice of Pendency |
||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 25 (Motion #1) 25 - The Cancellation of the Notice of Pendency |
||
April 03, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 09, 2023 |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED) *Corrected* 213 Chester Street, Brooklyn NY |
||
January 09, 2023 | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | ||
November 16, 2022 | SUMMONS | ||
November 16, 2022 |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY 213 Chester Street Brooklyn NY |
||
November 16, 2022 | COMPLAINT |