Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Roger J. Blackburn, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ryan, John Thomas, against Sanaa A. Marshall, represented by Caggiano, Robert Joseph, Schutrum, Jonathan Jeffery, Sorrels, Stephen Matthew, Webb, Brian Mcdonald, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with John J Ark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 19, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 11, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1) Skip Trace
Date: January 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 14, 2022ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: February 02, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2022ANSWER
Date: February 09, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 20, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 09, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 20, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
February 09, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
February 09, 2022 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
February 02, 2022 | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | ||
January 14, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 12, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 11, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 11, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Police Accident Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.