Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Westdale Sabal Point NC LLC VS Shameka Hatch
On December 11, 2023 a civil magistrate summary ejectment case was filed by Westdale Sabal Point Nc Llc, against Hatch, Shameka, in the jurisdiction of Mecklenburg County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 11, 2023
Last Refreshed
May 06, 2024
Filing Location
Mecklenburg County, NC
Filing Court House
Mecklenburg District Court
Category
Civil Magistrate Summary Ejectment
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Appealed
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a summary ejectment case filed in the General Court of Justice, District Court Division-Small Claims in Mecklenburg County, North Carolina. The plaintiff, Westdale Sabal Point NC LLC, dba Sabal Point Apartments, alleges that the…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Notice of Appeal-Summary Ejectment
Date: Jan 29, 2024Petition to Sue as an Indigent
Date: Jan 29, 2024Other/Miscellaneous
Date: Jan 29, 2024Summary Ejectment
Date: Jan 29, 2024Summary Ejectment
Date: Jan 22, 2024Return of Service - Served
Date: Jan 08, 2024Alias and Pluries Summons - Issued
Date: Dec 22, 2023Servicemember Civil Relief Act
Date: Dec 22, 2023Amend
Date: Dec 22, 2023Amended Pleading
Date: Dec 22, 2023Return of Service - Served
Date: Dec 15, 2023Servicemember Civil Relief Act
Date: Dec 11, 2023Complaint
Date: Dec 11, 2023Civil Summons
Date: Dec 11, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice Of Hearing | |
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal-Summary Ejectment | |
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition to Sue as an Indigent | |
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Other/Miscellaneous | |
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Summary Ejectment | |
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Summary Ejectment | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Return of Service - Served | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Alias and Pluries Summons - Issued | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Servicemember Civil Relief Act | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Amend | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Pleading | |
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of Service - Served | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Servicemember Civil Relief Act | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Summons |