Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Aaron's Sales & Lease vs. Mike Komjati
Small Claims case was filed by Aaron'S Sales & Lease, against Komjati, Mike, in the jurisdiction of Benson County, ND. Judge Foughty, Donovan presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 21, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 27, 2022
Filing Location
Benson County, ND
Judge
Category
Small Claims
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Case Outcome Type
Dismissed
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 6 -Dismissed -Dismissed |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 5 of Dismissal of Dismissal |
|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return Not Served Index # 4 -Def not found -Def not found |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Index # 3 -SC Instructional Letter -SC Instructional Letter |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 2 of Identification of Identification |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Claim Affidavit Index # 1 |