Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
AR Audit Services Inc vs. Rebecca Wisnesswarner
A Contract / Collection case was filed by Ar Audit Services Inc, represented by Meggi Romayne Ihland, against Wisnesswarner, Rebecca, in the jurisdiction of Benson County, ND. Judge Olson, Lonnie Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: AR Audit Services IncDebtor: Rebecca Wisnesswarner (ActiveEntered: 02/22/2019Docketed: 02/22/2019, 3:15 PMDamages: $472.79Current Costs Due: 06/10/2019, Execution, $10.00Interest Rate: 8.50% presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 07, 2019
Last Refreshed
September 27, 2022
Filing Location
Benson County, ND
Category
Contract / Collection
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Outcome Type
Money Judgment Entered
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 17 Satisfaction Satisfaction |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 16 Returned Returned |
|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 15 Issued-Mailed to Attorney Issued-Mailed to Attorney |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 13 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 14 Rebecca Wisnesswarner Rebecca Wisnesswarner |
|
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Findings Index # 10 of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment |
|
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 12 | |
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 11 of Costs and Disbursements of Costs and Disbursements |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 9 Judgment Attorney Meggi Ihland Judgment Attorney Meggi Ihland |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 4 Of Proof Assignment Merits And Verification Of Proof Assignment Merits And Verification |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 6 Of Default Of Default |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 5 Of Identification And Non-Military Status Of Identification And Non-Military Status |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 7 Affidavit Of Costs And Disbursements Attorney Meggi Ihland Affidavit Of Costs And Disbursements Attorney Meggi Ihland |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Findings Index # 8 Finding Of Fact Conclusions Of Law And Order For Judgment Attorney Meggi Ihland Finding Of Fact Conclusions Of Law And Order For Judgment Attorney Meggi Ihland |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint Index # 1 Complaint Complaint |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 3 Service Rebecca Wisnesswarner Service Rebecca Wisnesswarner |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 2 Summons Summons |