Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
State of North Dakota by Workforce Safety & Insurance vs. KABU Radio
A Contract / Collection case was filed by State Of North Dakota By Workforce Safety & Insurance, represented by Anne Jorgenson Green, against Kabu Radio, in the jurisdiction of Benson County, ND. Judge Olson, Lonnie Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: State of North Dakota by Workforce Safety & InsuranceDebtor: KABU Radio (ActiveEntered: 03/31/2020Docketed: 03/31/2020, 1:15 PMDamages: $704.22Interest Rate: 8.00% presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 16, 2020
Last Refreshed
August 09, 2023
Filing Location
Benson County, ND
Category
Contract / Collection
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Outcome Type
Money Judgment Entered
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 21 Satisfaction of Judgment Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 20 and Return-Fully Satisfied and Return-Fully Satisfied |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 19 Issued to Sheriff Issued to Sheriff |
|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 18 Service Document - Affidavit of Service by Mail - Service of Notice of Entry of Judgment on Defendant Service Document - Affidavit of Service by Mail - Service of Notice of Entry of Judgment on Defendant |
|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 17 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 15 of Statement of Costs and Disbursements of Statement of Costs and Disbursements |
|
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 14 for Judgment for Judgment |
|
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 16 | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment and Case Number Index # 13 | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 11 Affidavit of Publication Affidavit of Publication |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 6 Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 12 Affidavit of Identification Affidavit of Identification |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 9 Exhibit A - Copy of Billing Statement Exhibit A - Copy of Billing Statement |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 10 Proposed Order Filed by Attorney Anne Green Proposed Order Filed by Attorney Anne Green |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 8 Proposed Judgment filed by Attorney Anne Green Proposed Judgment filed by Attorney Anne Green |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 7 Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements filed by Attorney Anne Green Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements filed by Attorney Anne Green |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 5 Affidavit of Default Affidavit of Default |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 4 Affidavit of Service by Mail - Copies of the Summons (which was published) and the Complaint sent to KABU Radio on 1-31-20 Affidavit of Service by Mail - Copies of the Summons (which was published) and the Complaint sent to KABU Radio on 1-31-20 |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 3 Affidavit for Service by Publication Affidavit for Service by Publication |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 2 Summons Summons |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Index # 1 Complaint Complaint |