Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Nelson, Teresa Beth, filed a(n) Restraining Order case against Kimmerly, Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Benson County, ND, . Benson County, ND Superior Courts with Donovan J. Foughty presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 03, 2023 |
CategoryRestraining Order |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationBenson County, ND |
|
Case Outcome TypeService Document Index # 15 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 14 on Petitioner on Petitioner |
|
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 15 on Respondent on Respondent |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order Index # 13 | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Protection/Restraining Order Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Foughty, Donovan) Petitioner via REM 11/13/2023 Reset by Court to 11/27/2023 Result: Hearing Ended Petitioner via REM |
|
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Sheriff's Return Served Index # 12 | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Temporary Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order Index # 10 Amended Amended |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 9 Amended for Temporary Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order Amended for Temporary Disorderly Conduct Restraining Order |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Document Index # 11 | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Protection/Restraining Order Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Foughty, Donovan) | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 6 to appear via REM to appear via REM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.