Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DCI Credit Services Inc vs. Dustin A Sackenreuter
A Contract / Collection case was filed by Dci Credit Services Inc, represented by Daniel James Nagle, against Sackenreuter, Dustin A, in the jurisdiction of Benson County, ND. Judge Foughty, Donovan Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: DCI Credit Services IncDebtor: Dustin A Sackenreuter (ActiveEntered: 09/28/2021Docketed: 09/28/2021, 10:57 AMDamages: $1,290.25Current Costs Due: 02/17/2022, Execution, $10.0008/22/2022, Execution, $10.0011/26/2021, Execution, $10.00Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 11, 2021
Last Refreshed
August 08, 2023
Filing Location
Benson County, ND
Category
Contract / Collection
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Outcome Type
Money Judgment Entered
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 23 Satisfaction of Judgment - Dustin A Sackenreuter Satisfaction of Judgment - Dustin A Sackenreuter |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Filing Index # 24 Execution of Judgment - Dustin A Sackenreuter Execution of Judgment - Dustin A Sackenreuter |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Execution Index # 22 | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Filing Index # 21 Return of Execution (no satisfaction) Return of Execution (no satisfaction) |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 20 Isssed(Sent to DCI) Isssed(Sent to DCI) |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 19 Returned Returned |
|
November 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 18 Sent to Plt counsel Sent to Plt counsel |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 17 Notice of Entry of Judgment - Dustin A Sackenreuter Notice of Entry of Judgment - Dustin A Sackenreuter |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 16 Affidavit of Service by Mail - Notice of Entry of Judgment - Dustin A Sackenreuter Affidavit of Service by Mail - Notice of Entry of Judgment - Dustin A Sackenreuter |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 14 of Costs of Costs |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 15 | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Findings Index # 13 /Order /Order |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 12 Notice of Filing of Summons and Complaint - Dustin A Sackenreuter Notice of Filing of Summons and Complaint - Dustin A Sackenreuter |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 11 Affidavit of Service by Mail - Notice of Filing of Summons and Complaint - Dustin A Sackenreuter Affidavit of Service by Mail - Notice of Filing of Summons and Complaint - Dustin A Sackenreuter |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 7 Affidavit of Costs Affidavit of Costs |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 9 Judgment - filer DCI Credit Services Inc Judgment - filer DCI Credit Services Inc |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Findings Index # 8 Of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment - filer DCI Credit Services Inc Of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment - filer DCI Credit Services Inc |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 5 Of Proof - Altru Health System $1147.75 Of Proof - Altru Health System $1147.75 |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return Served Index # 3 Sheriff Return - Summons and Complaint - Dustin Sackenreuter Sheriff Return - Summons and Complaint - Dustin Sackenreuter |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint Index # 1 Complaint Complaint |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 2 Summons Summons |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 6 Of Identity and as to Military Service Of Identity and as to Military Service |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 4 Of Default Of Default |