Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Burke County, ND, . Burke County, ND Superior Courts with Mattson, Douglas L Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: ProCollect Services LLCDebtor: Matthew Kulstad (Active, Debtor: Maralys Kulstad (ActiveEntered: 06/23/2017Docketed: 06/23/2017, 11:12 AMDamages: $887.00Current Costs Due: 12/08/2021, Execution, $10.00Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 20, 2017 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBurke County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 17 of Judgment - returning of Judgment - returning |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 16 Satisfaction of Judgment Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 15 Of Judgment Of Judgment |
|
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 13 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 14 Affidavit of Mailing on Maralys and Matthew Kulstad Affidavit of Mailing on Maralys and Matthew Kulstad |
|
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 12 by Default by Default |
|
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 11 for Judgment for Judgment |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 10 Proposed Judgment by Default by ProCollect Services LLC on Maralys and Matthew Kulstad Proposed Judgment by Default by ProCollect Services LLC on Maralys and Matthew Kulstad |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 4 Service Document on Matthew Kulstad Service Document on Matthew Kulstad |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Assignment Index # 7 Assignment Assignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.