Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Burke County, ND, . Burke County, ND Superior Courts with Mattson, Douglas L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 02, 2018 |
CategoryProbate Of Will (Informal) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBurke County, ND |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment / Order Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Report and Accounting Index # 10 Inventory and Final Accounting Inventory and Final Accounting |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Personal Representative's Sworn Statement to Close Estate Index # 11 Personal Representatives Sworn Statement to Close Estate Personal Representatives Sworn Statement to Close Estate |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 12 Proof of Service by Chad Anderson on Josephine Abercrombie Bryan Proof of Service by Chad Anderson on Josephine Abercrombie Bryan |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 8 Notice and Information to Heirs Notice and Information to Heirs |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 9 Affidavit of Service to Lillie Frank Abercrombie Affidavit of Service to Lillie Frank Abercrombie |
|
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement of Appointment of a Personal Representative Index # 6 - Informal - Informal |
|
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Letters Testamentary Index # 7 | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Last Will and Testament Index # 5 - Certified Copy - Certified Copy |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 4 Affidavit of Service to Department of Human Services Affidavit of Service to Department of Human Services |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Letters Index # 3 Letters Testamentary filed by Chad Anderson Letters Testamentary filed by Chad Anderson |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.