Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In the Estate of Frances Lindberg
A Probate Of Will (Informal) case was filed in the jurisdiction of Burke County, ND.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 26, 2020
Last Refreshed
September 02, 2022
Filing Location
Burke County, ND
Category
Probate of Will (Informal)
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
General Probate
Status
Closed
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 18 Proof of Service by Mail; SENT: November 16, 2020; TO: Jon LIndberg, Curtis Lindberg, and David Lindberg Proof of Service by Mail; SENT: November 16, 2020; TO: Jon LIndberg, Curtis Lindberg, and David Lindberg |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Personal Representative's Sworn Statement to Close Estate Index # 17 The Personal Representative's Verified Statement to Close the Estate The Personal Representative's Verified Statement to Close the Estate |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation / Agreement Index # 16 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisement Index # 13 Inventory and Appraisement Inventory and Appraisement |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 14 Notice of Proposed Distribution Notice of Proposed Distribution |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 15 Proof of Service by Mail; SENT: September 10, 2020; TO: Jon LIndberg, Curtis Lindberg, and David Lindberg Proof of Service by Mail; SENT: September 10, 2020; TO: Jon LIndberg, Curtis Lindberg, and David Lindberg |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 12 Affidavit of Publication Affidavit of Publication |
|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 10 Affidavit of Forwarding Copy of Petition Commencing Probate Proceedings to Supervising Departments Affidavit of Forwarding Copy of Petition Commencing Probate Proceedings to Supervising Departments |
|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 8 Notice and Information to Heirs and Devisees Notice and Information to Heirs and Devisees |
|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 11 Notice to Creditors Notice to Creditors |
|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 9 Proof of Service by Mail; SENT: June 12, 2020; TO Jon Lindberg, Curtis LIndberg, and David LIndberg Proof of Service by Mail; SENT: June 12, 2020; TO Jon Lindberg, Curtis LIndberg, and David LIndberg |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Letters Testamentary Index # 7 | |
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement of Appointment of a Personal Representative Index # 6 Statement of Informal Probate of Will and Appointment of a Personal Representative Statement of Informal Probate of Will and Appointment of a Personal Representative |
|
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment and Case Number Index # 5 | |
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Application for Appointment of Personal Representative Index # 1 Application for Informal Probate of Will and Appointment of a Personal Representative Application for Informal Probate of Will and Appointment of a Personal Representative |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Last Will and Testament Index # 2 Last Will and Testament of Frances Lindberg **Original Will received and filed in Clerk's Office** Last Will and Testament of Frances Lindberg **Original Will received and filed in Clerk's Office** |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Letters Index # 3 Letters Testamentary Letters Testamentary |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 4 Statement of Informal Probate of Will and Appointment of a Personal Representative Statement of Informal Probate of Will and Appointment of a Personal Representative |