Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In the Matter of the Estate of Harold L. Carlson
A Domiciliary Proceeding case was filed in the jurisdiction of Burke County, ND. Judge Mattson, Douglas L presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 21, 2021
Last Refreshed
August 11, 2023
Filing Location
Burke County, ND
Judge
Category
Domiciliary Proceeding
Case Outcome Type
Judgment / Order Entered
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 10 Affidavit of Service by Mailing( Keller Law Firm) Affidavit of Service by Mailing( Keller Law Firm) |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 9 Affidavit of Service by Mailing (Keller Law, LLC - Attn: Jessie Underwood) Affidavit of Service by Mailing (Keller Law, LLC - Attn: Jessie Underwood) |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 8 Order Recognizing the Filing of Proof of Authority of Foreign Personal Representative Order Recognizing the Filing of Proof of Authority of Foreign Personal Representative |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 5 Certified Copy of Order for Informal Probate of Will and Informal Appointment of Personal Reprsentative **Received and Filed in Clerks Office** Certified Copy of Order for Informal Probate of Will and Informal Appointment of Personal Reprsentative **Received and Filed in Clerks Office** |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Index # 4 Certified Copy of Letters Testamentary in Estate of Harold L. Carlson, a/k/a Harold Lee Carlson and Harold Carlson (copy only - original to be sent when case number assigned) **Received and Filed in Clerks Office** Certified Copy of Letters Testamentary in Estate of Harold L. Carlson, a/k/a Harold Lee Carlson and Harold Carlson (copy only - original to be sent when case number assigned) **Received and Filed in Clerks Office** |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 3 Order Establishing Filing of Proof of Authority of Domiciliary Foreign Personal Representative (Proposed)(John S. Steinberger, Jr.) Order Establishing Filing of Proof of Authority of Domiciliary Foreign Personal Representative (Proposed)(John S. Steinberger, Jr.) |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment and Case Number Index # 7 | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Last Will and Testament Index # 6 Certified Copy of Will of Harold L. Carlson in Estate of Harold L. Carlson, a/k/a Harold Lee Carlson and Harold Carlson (copy only - original to be sent when case number assigned) **Received and Filed in Clerks Office** Certified Copy of Will of Harold L. Carlson in Estate of Harold L. Carlson, a/k/a Harold Lee Carlson and Harold Carlson (copy only - original to be sent when case number assigned) **Received and Filed in Clerks Office** |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Index # 1 Request for Issuance of Proof of Authority of Domiciliary Foreign Personal Representative Request for Issuance of Proof of Authority of Domiciliary Foreign Personal Representative |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 2 Proof of Authority of Domiciliary Foreign Personal Representative (Proposed)(John S. Steinberger, Jr.) Proof of Authority of Domiciliary Foreign Personal Representative (Proposed)(John S. Steinberger, Jr.) |