Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In the Estate of Jean F. Kapp
A Probate Administration (Informal) case was filed in the jurisdiction of Burke County, ND.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 13, 2023
Last Refreshed
August 08, 2023
Filing Location
Burke County, ND
Category
Probate Administration (Informal)
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
General Probate
Status
Closed
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 13 of Publication of Publication |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 10 and Information to Heirs and Information to Heirs |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 11 to Creditors to Creditors |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 12 Proof of Service by Mail - Heirs Proof of Service by Mail - Heirs |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters of Administration Index # 8 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 9 of Forwarding Copy of Application or Petition to Supervising Department of Forwarding Copy of Application or Petition to Supervising Department |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Statement of Appointment of a Personal Representative Index # 7 Statement of Informal Appointment of Personal Representative Statement of Informal Appointment of Personal Representative |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Waiver Index # 5 of Right to Appointment of Right to Appointment |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 3 Statement of Informal Appointment of Personal Representative Statement of Informal Appointment of Personal Representative |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment and Case Number Index # 6 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Waiver Index # 4 of Right to Appointment of Right to Appointment |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Letters Index # 2 of Administration of Administration |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Application for Appointment of Personal Representative Index # 1 Application for Informal Appointment of a Personal Representative in Intestacy Application for Informal Appointment of a Personal Representative in Intestacy |