Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Logan County, ND, . Logan County, ND Superior Courts with Hagerty, Gail Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: A.R. Audit Services Inc.Debtor: Susan M Jensen (ActiveEntered: 10/10/2013Docketed: 10/10/2013, 11:01 AMDamages: $546.36Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 08, 2013 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLogan County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 21 Statement of Judgment Statement of Judgment |
|
January 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 20 Satisfaction Satisfaction |
|
October 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 19 Susan M Jensen Susan M Jensen |
|
October 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 18 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
October 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 16 | |
October 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 15 for Judgment for Judgment |
|
October 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Statement Index # 17 of Judgment of Judgment |
|
October 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 14 | |
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 13 Order For Judgment Order For Judgment |
|
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Brief Index # 8 Brief In Support Of Motion For Default Judgment Brief In Support Of Motion For Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.