Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Credit Collections Bureau vs. David Carrizales
A Contract / Collection case was filed in the jurisdiction of Logan County, ND. Judge Tufte, Jerod Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $819.28Creditor: Credit Collections BureauDebtor: David Carrizales (ActiveEntered: 01/04/2016Docketed: 01/04/2016, 4:03 PMDamages: $819.28Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 20, 2015
Last Refreshed
September 10, 2022
Filing Location
Logan County, ND
Judge
Hon. Tufte, Jerod Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $819.28Creditor: Credit Collections BureauDebtor: David Carrizales (ActiveEntered: 01/04/2016Docketed: 01/04/2016, 4:03 PMDamages: $819.28Interest Rate: 6.50%
Category
Contract / Collection
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Outcome Type
Judgment by Default
Status
Default Judgment
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 18 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 19 Affidavit of Service upon David Carrizales Affidavit of Service upon David Carrizales |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 16 for Judgment for Judgment |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 17 | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 15 | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 13 Default Judgment Default Judgment |
|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service of Motion Index # 14 Affidavit of Service upon David Carrizales Affidavit of Service upon David Carrizales |
|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 8 Affidavit of Costs Affidavit of Costs |
|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion Index # 6 Motion for Default Judgment Motion for Default Judgment |
|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 7 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment |
|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 12 Order for Judgment Order for Judgment |
|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Brief Index # 11 Judgment Brief in Support of Motion for Default Judgment Brief in Support of Motion for Default |
|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 9 Affidavit of Identity Affidavit of Identity |
|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 10 Notice of Motion Notice of Motion |
|
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 4 Notice of Filing and Assignment of Case Number Notice of Filing and Assignment of Case Number |
|
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 5 Affidavit of Service upon David Carrizales Affidavit of Service upon David Carrizales |
|
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 2 Summons Summons |
|
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 3 Service upon David Carrizales Service upon David Carrizales |
|
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint Index # 1 Complaint Complaint |