Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In the Matter of the Guardianship of Joyce M. Hayford
A Guardianship Of An Incapacitated Person case was filed in the jurisdiction of Logan County, ND.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 30, 2013
Last Refreshed
August 30, 2022
Filing Location
Logan County, ND
Category
Guardianship of an Incapacitated Person
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Guardianship,Conservatorship
Status
Closed
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 76 2022 Annual Wellbeing Report 2022 Annual Wellbeing Report |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 77 2022 Annual Financial Accounting 2022 Annual Financial Accounting |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Confidential Information Form Index # 78 2022 Annual Report 2022 Annual Report |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Annual Report Mailed Index # 75 | |
June 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 73 2021 Annual Financial Accounting 2021 Annual Financial Accounting |
|
June 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 72 2021 Annual Wellbeing Report 2021 Annual Wellbeing Report |
|
June 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Confidential Information Form Index # 74 2021 Annual Report 2021 Annual Report |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 71 | |
June 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 69 Annual Financial Accounting Annual Financial Accounting |
|
June 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Confidential Information Form Index # 70 Annual Report Annual Report |
|
June 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 68 Annual Wellbeing Report Annual Wellbeing Report |
|
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 66 Annual Financial Accounting Annual Financial Accounting |
|
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Confidential Information Form Index # 67 Annual Report Annual Report |
|
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 65 Annual Wellbeing Report Annual Wellbeing Report |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate Index # 63 Guardian Online Training Guardian Online Training |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 62 Guardian Qualifications Guardian Qualifications |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Probate Filing Index # 64 Criminal History Record Criminal History Record |
|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice Index # 61 | |
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement Index # 60 Mileage for Hearing--DKK Mileage for Hearing--DKK |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 58 Final Annual Accounting Final Annual Accounting |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Confidential Information Form Index # 59 Final Confidential Information Form Final Confidential Information Form |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 57 Final Annual Wellbeing Report Final Annual Wellbeing Report |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Letters for Guardianship Index # 56 | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Index # 55 | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Findings Index # 53 of Fact and Order Appointing Substitute Guardian Ad Litem of Fact and Order Appointing Substitute Guardian Ad Litem |
|
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Letters Index # 54 of Guardianship and Conservatorship--Guardian Angels Inc of Guardianship and Conservatorship--Guardian Angels Inc |
|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Continuation of Guardianship/Conservatorship (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Narum, Daniel D) 24LRAc1180507 Parties Present Result: Hearing Ended 24LRAc1180507 |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 51 Affidavit of Service (on Leo Ryan, DKK Guardian and Conservatorship, Sue Anderson, Joyce Hayford) Affidavit of Service (on Leo Ryan, DKK Guardian and Conservatorship, Sue Anderson, Joyce Hayford) |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Information on Continuation of Guardianship/Conservatorship Index # 52 Recommendation for Guardian At Litem Recommendation for Guardian At Litem |
|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Index # 49 | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Index # 50 Letter to Judge Narum Letter to Judge Narum |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Report Index # 48 Report of Guardian At Litem Report of Guardian At Litem |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Continuation of Guardianship/Conservatorship (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Narum, Daniel D) 23LRAc1180402 Recorded in LaMOure Parties Present 03/05/2018 Reset by Court to 04/02/2018 Result: Hearing Ended 23LRAc1180402 Recorded in LaMOure |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 47 Affidavit of Service (on Leo Ryan, DKK Guardian and Conservatorship, Sue Anderson, Joyve Hayford) Affidavit of Service (on Leo Ryan, DKK Guardian and Conservatorship, Sue Anderson, Joyve Hayford) |
|
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Guardianship Review Notice Index # 46 | |
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Guardianship Review Notice Index # 45 | |
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 44 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service |
|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 43 Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 42 Order Appointing GAL Order Appointing GAL |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Continuation of Guardianship/Conservatorship (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Narum, Daniel D) DKK To Appear Telephonic 24LRAc1180108 Parties Present 12/04/2017 Reset by Court to 01/08/2018 Result: Hearing Ended DKK To Appear Telephonic 24LRAc1180108 |
|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Review Notice Index # 41 Rescheduled Hearing-mailed to Parties Rescheduled Hearing-mailed to Parties |
|
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 40 for Telephonic Appearance for Telephonic Appearance |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Guardianship Review Notice Index # 39 | |
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Information on Continuation of Guardianship/Conservatorship Index # 37 Information Related to Continuation of Guardianship Information Related to Continuation of Guardianship |
|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 38 proposed telephonic appearance request and order filed by Kristie Kinzell, DKK Guardian and Conservatorship Service Inc. proposed telephonic appearance request and order filed by Kristie Kinzell, DKK Guardian and Conservatorship Service Inc. |
|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Review Notice Index # 36 mailed to DKK mailed to DKK |
|
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 34 of Transfer to County of Residence of Ward (Logan) of Transfer to County of Residence of Ward (Logan) |
|
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk Certificate for Change of Venue Notice Index # 35 | |
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 33 Confidential Information Confidential Information |
|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 31 Annual Wellbeing Report Annual Wellbeing Report |
|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 32 Annual Accounting Annual Accounting |
|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 30 guardians an guardians an |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Letter Index # 29 | |
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 28 | |
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 27 Guardians Annual Report Guardians Annual Report |
|
October 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Report Index # 25 letter letter |
|
October 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Guardian and/or Conservatorship Annual Report Index # 26 | |
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Report Index # 24 90 day asset report 90 day asset report |
|
October 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 22 Certificate Certificate |
|
October 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 23 Affidavit of Service By Mail Affidavit of Service By Mail |
|
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Findings Index # 21 of Fact and Order Appointing Guardian and Conservator of Fact and Order Appointing Guardian and Conservator |
|
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Letters for Guardianship/Conservatorship Index # 20 | |
October 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Guardianship / Conservatorship Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Greenwood, John) Result: Hearing Ended | |
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 19 Affidavit of Service by Electronic Filing Affidavit of Service by Electronic Filing |
|
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Report Index # 17 Visitor's Report Visitor's Report |
|
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Report Index # 18 Report of Guardian Ad Litem Report of Guardian Ad Litem |
|
September 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Report Index # 16 Physician's Report Physician's Report |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 15 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service |
|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 14 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 13 Affidavit of Service by Mail Affidavit of Service by Mail |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Petition Index # 12 Amended Petition for Guardianship and Conservatorship Amended Petition for Guardianship and Conservatorship |
|
September 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 11 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service |
|
August 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 9 Affidavit of Service By Mail Affidavit of Service By Mail |
|
August 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 10 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service |
|
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Visitor Index # 6 | |
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem Index # 8 | |
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Physician Index # 7 | |
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 5 Order Guardian Ad Litem Order Guardian Ad Litem |
|
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 3 Order Visitor Order Visitor |
|
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 4 Order Physician Order Physician |
|
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 2 Notice of Hearing on Petition Notice of Hearing on Petition |
|
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Petition Index # 1 Petition for Guardianship Petition for Guardianship |
|
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Filed |