Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ona's Rentals, LLC vs. Joseph Dudley Herrick
A Forcible Detainer case was filed in the jurisdiction of Logan County, ND. Judge Narum, Daniel D Decision on eviction needed. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 11, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 29, 2024
Filing Location
Logan County, ND
Category
Forcible Detainer
Case Outcome Type
Service Document Index # 22
Status
Active
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 22 Sheriff's Return Sheriff's Return |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 16 Proposed Judgment of Eviction (James W. Martens) Proposed Judgment of Eviction (James W. Martens) |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 18 Eviction and costs Eviction and costs |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 20 Notice of Entry of Order & Judgment Notice of Entry of Order & Judgment |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 15 Proposed Order of Eviction (James W. Martens) Proposed Order of Eviction (James W. Martens) |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 19 | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 17 of Eviction of Eviction |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 14 Statement of Costs and Disbursements (James W. Martens) Statement of Costs and Disbursements (James W. Martens) |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 21 Certificate of Service (Joseph Dudley Herrick) Certificate of Service (Joseph Dudley Herrick) |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 13 Certificate of Service (Joseph Dudley Herrick) Certificate of Service (Joseph Dudley Herrick) |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Under Advisement (Judicial Officer: Narum, Daniel D ) Decision on eviction needed. Decision on eviction needed. |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 12 PL Exhibit B: Repair estimate PL Exhibit B: Repair estimate |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Narum, Daniel D) Eviction Hearing CourtSmart/LaMoure/Laurel Result: Hearing Ended Eviction Hearing CourtSmart/LaMoure/Laurel |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Narum, Daniel D) Eviction Hearing Eviction Hearing |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return Served Index # 11 Sheriff's Return (Herick, Joseph Dudley) Sheriff's Return (Herick, Joseph Dudley) |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return Served Index # 10 Notice of Eviction, PL Exhibit A Notice of Eviction, PL Exhibit A |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 4 Notice of Intention to Evict Notice of Intention to Evict |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint Index # 2 Eviction Complaint Eviction Complaint |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 1 Eviction Summons Eviction Summons |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return Served Index # 5 Sheriff's Return (Notice of Intent to Evict - Joseph Herrick) Sheriff's Return (Notice of Intent to Evict - Joseph Herrick) |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 9 Notice to Appear 8/25/23 Notice to Appear 8/25/23 |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 3 Exhibit A (Affidavit of Vendor, Notice of Cancellation of Contract for Deed & Sheriff's Return) Exhibit A (Affidavit of Vendor, Notice of Cancellation of Contract for Deed & Sheriff's Return) |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment and Case Number Index # 7 |