Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Discover Bank vs. Holly K Rohrich
A Contract / Collection case was filed in the jurisdiction of Logan County, ND.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 24, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 29, 2024
Filing Location
Logan County, ND
Category
Contract / Collection
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Outcome Type
Service Document Index # 19
Status
Active
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 19 Certificate of Service (Holly K Rohrich) Certificate of Service (Holly K Rohrich) |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 18 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 15 for Judgment for Judgment |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 17 | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 16 | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 13 Notice of Filing Complaint Notice of Filing Complaint |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 14 Certificate of Service (Holly K Rohrich) Certificate of Service (Holly K Rohrich) |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service of Motion Index # 10 Certificate of Service (Holly K Rohrich) Certificate of Service (Holly K Rohrich) |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 12 Exhibit 1 (Account Summary) Exhibit 1 (Account Summary) |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 11 Notice of Motion for Default Judgment Notice of Motion for Default Judgment |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Brief Index # 5 Brief Brief |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint Index # 1 Complaint Complaint |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 9 Proposed Default Judgment- filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Proposed Default Judgment- filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 2 Summons Summons |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 6 Affidavit of No Answer, Identification, Non-Military Status and Proof Affidavit of No Answer, Identification, Non-Military Status and Proof |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return Served Index # 3 Sheriff's Return (Holly Rohrich) Sheriff's Return (Holly Rohrich) |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 8 Proposed Order for Judgment - filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Proposed Order for Judgment - filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 7 Affidavit of Costs and Disbursements Affidavit of Costs and Disbursements |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Index # 4 Motion for Default Judgment Motion for Default Judgment |