Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Keith Kinzler, et al. vs. First Trust Company of Arizona
A Quiet Title case was filed in the jurisdiction of Logan County, ND.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 06, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 29, 2024
Filing Location
Logan County, ND
Category
Quiet Title
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Quiet Title
Case Outcome Type
Judgment Index # 16
Status
Active
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 15 for Judgment, Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law for Judgment, Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 16 | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 12 Exhibit E to Brief in Support of Default Judgment Exhibit E to Brief in Support of Default Judgment |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Findings Index # 13 Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order for Judgment Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order for Judgment |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 11 Exhibit D to Brief in Support of Default Judgment Exhibit D to Brief in Support of Default Judgment |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Application Index # 6 Application for Default Judgment Application for Default Judgment |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 14 Proposed Judgment Proposed Judgment |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 10 Exhibit C to Brief in Support of Default Judgment Exhibit C to Brief in Support of Default Judgment |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Brief Index # 7 Brief In Support of Default Judgment Brief In Support of Default Judgment |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 5 Affidavit of Default Affidavit of Default |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 9 Exhibit B to Brief in Support of Default Judgment Exhibit B to Brief in Support of Default Judgment |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 8 Exhibit A to Brief in Support of Default Judgment Exhibit A to Brief in Support of Default Judgment |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 4 Affidavit of Publication Affidavit of Publication |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 2 Summons Summons |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint Index # 1 Complaint Complaint |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 3 Affidavit of Service by Publication Affidavit of Service by Publication |