Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Nelson County, ND, . Nelson County, ND Superior Courts with Thelen, John Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: Deere & CompanyDebtor: Richard McDonald (ActiveEntered: 04/06/2016Docketed: 04/06/2016, 9:09 AMDamages: $21,976.77Current Costs Due: 06/10/2016, Execution, $10.00Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedSeptember 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNelson County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 34 Satisfac tion of Judgment Satisfac tion of Judgment |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 33 to Withdraw Prior Motion to Withdraw Prior Motion |
|
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Index # 31 Motion to withdraw prior OTC motion Motion to withdraw prior OTC motion |
|
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 32 Proposed order to withdraw prior motion Proposed order to withdraw prior motion |
|
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 30 Proposed Order to Show Cause from Deere (Unsigned - Motion/Order to Withdraw) Proposed Order to Show Cause from Deere (Unsigned - Motion/Order to Withdraw) |
|
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service of Motion Index # 29 Affidavit of service of Motion for Order to Show Cause Affidavit of service of Motion for Order to Show Cause |
|
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 28 Notice of Motion for Order to Show Cause Notice of Motion for Order to Show Cause |
|
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Brief Index # 27 Brief in support of Motion to Show Cause Brief in support of Motion to Show Cause |
|
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 26 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Show Cause Affidavit in Support of Motion to Show Cause |
|
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Index # 25 Motion for Order to Show Cause Motion for Order to Show Cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.