Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nelson County, ND, . Nelson County, ND Superior Courts with Hager, Donald presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNelson County, ND |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment / Order Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Service Document Index # 136 | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 135 of Custodial Parent of Custodial Parent |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Index # 134 Aff. of Custodial Parent (No Mail Receptacle) Aff. of Custodial Parent (No Mail Receptacle) |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 130 Full and Final Satisfaction of Judgment Full and Final Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 133 Affidavit of Service upon Kerry Rosenquist Affidavit of Service upon Kerry Rosenquist |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 132 Exhibit A to Full and Final Satisfaction - Legal Descriptions Exhibit A to Full and Final Satisfaction - Legal Descriptions |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 131 Affidavit of Service upon Kerry Rosenquist Affidavit of Service upon Kerry Rosenquist |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 128 Notice of Entry of Corrected Amended Judgment Notice of Entry of Corrected Amended Judgment |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 129 Affidavit of Service upon Kerry Rosenquist Affidavit of Service upon Kerry Rosenquist |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 126 Granting Entry of Corrected Amended Judgment Granting Entry of Corrected Amended Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.