Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Nelson County, ND, . Nelson County, ND Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2017 |
CategoryAdministrative Filing |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationNelson County, ND |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return Served Index # 8 200 Main St (Reiter) w/hospital report 200 Main St (Reiter) w/hospital report |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return Served Index # 7 Inventory and Receipt; 109 4th St W Apt 4; Lakota ND Inventory and Receipt; 109 4th St W Apt 4; Lakota ND |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Search Warrant Index # 6 109 4th St W Apt 4, Lakota ND 109 4th St W Apt 4, Lakota ND |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 5 and Application for Search Warrant and Application for Search Warrant |
|
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 3 for Search Warrant (blood tests of JLB) for Search Warrant (blood tests of JLB) |
|
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Search Warrant Index # 4 (blood tests of JLB) (blood tests of JLB) |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 1 and Application for Search Warant and Application for Search Warant |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Search Warrant Index # 2 200 Main St. McVille ND 58254 (blood tests of T. Reiter) 200 Main St. McVille ND 58254 (blood tests of T. Reiter) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.