Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Auto Credit, Inc vs. Tristen H Tilton
A Contract / Collection case was filed in the jurisdiction of Nelson County, ND. Judge McCarthy, Jason Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $10,649.72Creditor: Auto Credit, IncDebtor: Tristen H Tilton (ActiveEntered: 11/22/2017Docketed: 11/22/2017, 4:33 PMDamages: $10,649.72Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 26, 2017
Last Refreshed
September 14, 2022
Filing Location
Nelson County, ND
Category
Contract / Collection
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Outcome Type
Money Judgment Entered
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 21 Affidavit of Service by Mail - Tristen Tilton Affidavit of Service by Mail - Tristen Tilton |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 20 Notice of Entry of Judgment - Tristen Tilton Notice of Entry of Judgment - Tristen Tilton |
|
November 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 18 | |
November 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 19 | |
November 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 17 Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 12 Judgment - Filed by Shelly Walsh, Auto Credit, Inc Judgment - Filed by Shelly Walsh, Auto Credit, Inc |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service of Motion Index # 16 Affidavit of Service by Mail - Tristen Tilton Affidavit of Service by Mail - Tristen Tilton |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 7 Affidavit of Service by Mail - Tristen Tilton Affidavit of Service by Mail - Tristen Tilton |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 2 Summons - Tristen Tilton Summons - Tristen Tilton |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 15 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment - Tristen Tilton Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment - Tristen Tilton |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Findings Index # 11 Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment - Filed by Shelly Walsh, Auto Credit, Inc Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment - Filed by Shelly Walsh, Auto Credit, Inc |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 3 Affidavit of Service - Tristen Tilton Affidavit of Service - Tristen Tilton |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Brief Index # 14 Brief in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment - Tristen Tilton Brief in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment - Tristen Tilton |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 8 Affidavit of Proof in Support of Default Judgment - Tristen Tilton Affidavit of Proof in Support of Default Judgment - Tristen Tilton |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 10 Statement of Costs and Disbursements - Filed by Shelly Walsh, Auto Credit, Inc Statement of Costs and Disbursements - Filed by Shelly Walsh, Auto Credit, Inc |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint Index # 1 Complaint - Tristen Tilton Complaint - Tristen Tilton |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 5 Affidavit of Identification and as to Military Service - Tristen Tilton Affidavit of Identification and as to Military Service - Tristen Tilton |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 6 Notice of Intent to Enter Judgment by Default - Tristen Tilton Notice of Intent to Enter Judgment by Default - Tristen Tilton |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 4 Affidavit of Default - Tristen Tilton Affidavit of Default - Tristen Tilton |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Index # 13 Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Default Judgment - Tristen Tilton Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Default Judgment - Tristen Tilton |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 9 Exhibit A - Retail Contract - Tristen Tilton Exhibit A - Retail Contract - Tristen Tilton |