Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In the Estate of Helen Marie Fosse
A Probate Administration (Informal) case was filed in the jurisdiction of Nelson County, ND.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 02, 2019
Last Refreshed
September 01, 2022
Filing Location
Nelson County, ND
Category
Probate Administration (Informal)
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
General Probate
Status
Closed
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Personal Representative's Sworn Statement to Close Estate Index # 13 filed pursuant to N.D.C.C. section 30.1-21-03 filed pursuant to N.D.C.C. section 30.1-21-03 |
|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 14 Attorney's Certificate of Service - Sworn Statement to Close Estate - served on Cathy Dyck, Margaret Ross, and Dotty Curry by regular first-class U.S. mail. Attorney's Certificate of Service - Sworn Statement to Close Estate - served on Cathy Dyck, Margaret Ross, and Dotty Curry by regular first-class U.S. mail. |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 11 Statement of Informal Appointment of Personal Representative in Intestacy (filed by applicant Jaima M Curry) Statement of Informal Appointment of Personal Representative in Intestacy (filed by applicant Jaima M Curry) |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Letters Testamentary Index # 12 | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Letters Index # 8 of Administration with signed Acceptance of Appointment as Personal Representative (document filed and acceptance signed by applicant Jaima M Curry) of Administration with signed Acceptance of Appointment as Personal Representative (document filed and acceptance signed by applicant Jaima M Curry) |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Confidential Information Form Index # 3 Personal identifying information of decedent (filed in accordance with N.D. R. Ct. 3.4) (Confidential) Personal identifying information of decedent (filed in accordance with N.D. R. Ct. 3.4) (Confidential) |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment and Case Number Index # 9 | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Application for Appointment of Personal Representative Index # 1 Intestate Estate (informal proceedings) Intestate Estate (informal proceedings) |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Consent Index # 6 Renunciation (waiver) of Right and Priority for Appointment and Consent to Appointment of Jaima M Curry as Personal Representative of Decedent's Estate (filed by Dorothy ("Dotty") Curry) Renunciation (waiver) of Right and Priority for Appointment and Consent to Appointment of Jaima M Curry as Personal Representative of Decedent's Estate (filed by Dorothy ("Dotty") Curry) |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Consent Index # 5 Renunciation (waiver) of Right and Priority for Appointment and Consent to Appointment of Jaima M Curry as Personal Representative of Decedent's Estate (filed by Margaret Ross) Renunciation (waiver) of Right and Priority for Appointment and Consent to Appointment of Jaima M Curry as Personal Representative of Decedent's Estate (filed by Margaret Ross) |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Consent Index # 4 Renunciation (waiver) of Right and Priority for Appointment and Consent to Appointment of Jaima M Curry as Personal Representative of Decedent's Estate (filed by Catherine ("Cathy") Dyck) Renunciation (waiver) of Right and Priority for Appointment and Consent to Appointment of Jaima M Curry as Personal Representative of Decedent's Estate (filed by Catherine ("Cathy") Dyck) |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate Index # 2 ND Department of Health Certification of Death - Helen Marie Fosse - Date of Death: 08/24/2018 (SSN Redacted) (Confidential) ND Department of Health Certification of Death - Helen Marie Fosse - Date of Death: 08/24/2018 (SSN Redacted) (Confidential) |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 7 Statement of Informal Appointment of Personal Representative in Intestacy (filed by applicant Jaima M Curry) Statement of Informal Appointment of Personal Representative in Intestacy (filed by applicant Jaima M Curry) |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 10 of Counsel confirming forwarding copy of probate application to ND Dept. of Human Services (filed by attorney Adam Fleischman) of Counsel confirming forwarding copy of probate application to ND Dept. of Human Services (filed by attorney Adam Fleischman) |