Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Nelson County, ND, . Nelson County, ND Superior Courts with Thelen, John Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: Ingenuity RM, LLCDebtor: Maria R Nenow (ActiveEntered: 10/19/2021Docketed: 10/19/2021, 10:43 AMDamages: $2,617.41Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 08, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNelson County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 21 Proof of Service by Mail - Maria R Nenow Proof of Service by Mail - Maria R Nenow |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 20 Satisfaction of Judgment Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Index # 19 Proof of Service by Mail - Maria R Nenow Proof of Service by Mail - Maria R Nenow |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 18 Notice of Entry of Judgment - Maria R Nenow Notice of Entry of Judgment - Maria R Nenow |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 17 | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 16 Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, Order for Judgment (Kranda) Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, Order for Judgment (Kranda) |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 15 | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Index # 8 of Default of Default |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Index # 7 of Identification of Identification |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 11 Exhibit A - Defendant's Accounts Exhibit A - Defendant's Accounts |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.